New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:17-cv-05823
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2017
Re-opened:Jan 18, 2018
Terminated:Sep 23, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Jan 28, 2018 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
Wimal Ariyawansa
Defendant
Sharika Gordon
Defendant
Local 803 Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant
Local 803 Pension Fund
Plaintiff
Demos P. Demopoulos
Represented By
Erin Veronica McGee
Friedman & Anspach
contact info
William Anspach
Friedman & Anspach
contact info
Eugene S. Friedman
Friedman & Anspach
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Spinelli
Represented By
Erin Veronica McGee
Friedman & Anspach
contact info
William Anspach
Friedman & Anspach
contact info
Eugene S. Friedman
Friedman & Anspach
contact info
Plaintiff
Local 553, I.B.T.
Represented By
Erin Veronica McGee
Friedman & Anspach
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Joseph Libertelli
Terminated: 01/16/2018
Represented By
Zachary Richard Harkin
O'Dwyer And Bernstein, L.L.P.
contact info
Jason Fuiman
O'Dwyer And Bernstein, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Billie Lee Whelan
Terminated: 01/16/2018
Represented By
Zachary Richard Harkin
O'Dwyer And Bernstein, L.L.P.
contact info
Jason Fuiman
O'Dwyer And Bernstein, L.L.P.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, September 23, 2019
132 132 order Judgment Mon 09/23 11:50 AM
JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted a declaratory judgment that the Cause Provision and the Participation Provision violate ERISA; and, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants are permanently enjoined from enforcing the Cause Provision and Participation Provision; and, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendants shall each bear their own attorneys' fees and costs incurred in this action. SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 131 and to close the case. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/23/19) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
131 131 motion Leave to File Document Fri 09/20 4:17 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Judgment addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from William Anspach dated 09/20/2019. Document filed by Local 553, I.B.T..(Anspach, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment