Pfizer Inc. v. United States of America
Original Case: 1:16-cv-01870
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02307 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2019 4:32 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae
Harvard Federal Tax Clinic
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Pfizer Inc., and Subsidiaries
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Pfizer, Inc., and Subsidiaries
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2019 4:30 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Pfizer Inc., FILED. [2088350] 17-2307 [Entered: 07/28/2017 10:03 AM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION and ORDER, dated 05/12/2017, RECEIVED.[2088359] 17-2307 [Entered: 07/28/2017 10:06 AM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/30/2017, RECEIVED.[2088364] 17-2307 [Entered: 07/28/2017 10:08 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Pfizer Inc., district court receipt # 0208-13940455., FILED.[2088371] 17-2307 [Entered: 07/28/2017 10:11 AM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2088383] 17-2307 [Entered: 07/28/2017 10:13 AM] |