Original Case: 3:17-cv-01017

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-56081
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2017
Terminated:Jul 17, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Jul 19, 2018 1:30 AM PDT
Amicus Curiae
GAVIN NEWSOM
Represented By
Anthony P. Schoenberg
Farella Braun & Martel LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
STATES OF ARIZONA, ALABAMA, ARKANSAS, GEORGIA, IDAHO, KANSAS, LOUISIANA, MICHIGAN, MISSOURI, MONTANA, NORTH DAKOTA, , OHIO, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTH DAKOTA, UTAH, WEST VIRGINIA, and WYOMING
Represented By
Oramel H. Skinner III
Arizona Attorney General's Office
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CALIFORNIA STATE SHERIFFS ASSOCIATION, WESTERN STATES SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA RESERVE PEACE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION, SAN FRANCISCO VETERAN POLICE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA GANG INVESTIGATORS ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL LAW ENFORCEMENT EDUCATOR
Represented By
Dan M. Peterson
Dan M Peterson PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION FREEDOM ACTION FOUNDATION
Represented By
David H. Thompson
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
SHOOTERS COMMITTEE ON POLITICAL EDUCATION (SCOPE, INC.)
Represented By
Maximillian G. Tresmond
Tresmond & Tresmond
contact info
Amicus Curiae
DOCTORS FOR RESPONSIBLE GUN OWNERSHIP, INDEPENDENCE INSTITUTE, AND MILLENNIAL POLICY CENTER
Represented By
Joseph Greenlee
Jolein A. Harro, P.C.
contact info
Amicus Curiae
EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
Represented By
Antonio Perez-Marques
Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
GAYS AGAINST GUNS
Represented By
Jamie A. Levitt
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
EQUALITY CALIFORNIA
Represented By
Jamie A. Levitt
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CITY OF SUNNYVALE
Represented By
Victoria L. Weatherford
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Amicus Curiae
PRIDE FUND TO END GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By
Jamie A. Levitt
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By
Victoria L. Weatherford
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By
Victoria L. Weatherford
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Amicus Curiae
GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By
Anthony P. Schoenberg
Farella Braun & Martel LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CALIFORNIA ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS
Represented By
Jonathan K. Baum
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, CALIFORNIA
Represented By
Jonathan K. Baum
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
CALIFORNIA CHAPTER OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS
Represented By
Jonathan K. Baum
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By
Paul Wolfson
WilmerHale
contact info
Amicus Curiae
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, NEW YORK, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, VIRGINIA, AND WASHINGTON
Represented By
Sonya L. Lebsack
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By
Alexandra Robert Gordon
AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
John Darrow Echeverria
California Department of Justice
contact info
Anthony Paul O'Brien
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
VIRGINIA DUNCAN
Represented By
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION, INC., a California corporation
Represented By
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER WADDELL
Represented By
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DAVID MARGUGLIO
Represented By
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PATRICK LOVETTE
Represented By
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RICHARD LEWIS
Represented By
Carl D. Michel
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Kasdin Miller Mitchell
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Sean Anthony Brady
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Paul D. Clement
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Erin E. Murphy
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Anna Barvir
Michel & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/19/2018 1:28 AM PDT
Friday, July 28, 2017
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [10525018] (RT) [Entered: 07/28/2017 09:47 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KAM): The appeal filed July 27, 2017 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than August 24, 2017; the answering brief is due September 21, 2017 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The parties are reminded that streamlined requests for extensions of time are not available in preliminary injunction appeals. See http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/content/view.php?pk_id=0000000638. Any request for an extension of time must be requested under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. . [10525450] (TSP) [Entered: 07/28/2017 12:02 PM]
Related: [-]