Original Case: 4:16-cv-00052

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-02555
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2017
Terminated:Aug 22, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 23, 2017 3:34 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By
Jordan S. Huttenlocker
DYKEMA GOSSETT PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANTHONY G. TAYLOR
Represented By
Anthony G. Taylor
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/23/2017 3:29 AM CDT
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Anthony G. Taylor by 08/07/2017. Transcript information sheet due by 08/15/2017. [1] [6858141] 17-2555 (CAG)
Related: [-]