Zurbriggen et al v. Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc.
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John J Tharp, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-05648 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2018 2:56 AM CST |
Defendant
Twin Hill Acquisition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American Airlines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dena Catan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thor Zurbriggen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Bell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Catan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynnette Chester
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doug Crumrine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Haley Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LuJuan Preston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Terry
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Laura Urquhart
Terminated: 01/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
1. | American Airlines amended uniform lawsuit hits at carrier hard (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Tue 10/09/2018 | |
2. | Flight attendants file lawsuit over American Airlines uniforms for allegedly causing health problems (latimes.com) |
Submitted Fri 08/04/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10/09/2018 3:00 PM CDT |