Minnesota District Court
Judge:Susan Richard Nelson
Referred: Tony N Leung
Case #: 0:17-cv-03509
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2017
Terminated:Oct 06, 2017
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2018 3:32 AM CST
Defendant
Michael Rothman
Represented By
Oliver J Larson
contact info
Plaintiff
Kris Lindahl
Represented By
Michael A Hatch
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/01/2024 11:59 PM CST
Friday, October 06, 2017
8 8 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 10/06 4:25 PM
ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice, re:7 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/06/2017. (SMD)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/06 11:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Michael Rothman. Jointly Signed by Kris Lindahl.(Larson, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Settlement Agmt.
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/26 8:18 AM
ORDER that 1. Defendant will answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint by October 18, 2017. 2. Defendant will file a response to the motion for a preliminary injunction by October 18, 2017.3. Plaintiff will file any reply brief in support of his motion for a preliminary injunction by November 3, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/25/17. (kt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 09/20 11:52 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Rothman. Jointly Signed by Kris Lindahl. (Larson, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2017
4 4 service Certificate of Service Thu 09/07 1:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kris Lindahl re1 Complaint (Hatch, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 08/02 11:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Michael Rothman. (kt)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 08/02 11:08 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th Civil Rights List and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 17-cv-3509 SRN/TNL. (kt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/02 11:01 AM
COMPLAINT against Michael Rothman ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5646349.) filed by Kris Lindahl. Filer requests summons issued. (Hatch, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet