Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-40595

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary Grace Diehl
Case #: 4:17-ap-04027
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2017
Terminated:Dec 06, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Linda Proctor Manton
P.O. Box 1148
Ringgold, GA 30736
Represented By
Leslie M. Pineyro
Jones And Walden, LLC
contact info
Defendant
TLM Diversified, LLC
P.O. Box 1148
Ringgold, GA 30736
Represented By
TLM Diversified, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Manton Family Partnership, LLLP
P.O. Box 1148
Ringgold, GA 30736
Represented By
Manton Family Partnership, LLLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Manton
P.O. Box 1148
Ringgold, GA 30736
Represented By
Thomas Manton
contact info
Plaintiff
First Bank of Dalton
P.O. Box 459
Dalton, GA 30722
Represented By
Jonathan L. Bledsoe
Minor, Bell & Neal, P.C.
contact info

GPO Feb 28 2018
Order (I) GRANTING Trustee's Motion to Intervene (Related Doc # 3) Service by BNC, DENYING First Bank of Dalton's Motion to Remand (Related Doc # 9) Service by BNC, GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Substitute the Trustee as the Plaintiff (Related Doc # 12) Service by BNC. Entered on 2/28/2018. (mrr)ORDERED that Motion to Intervene is GRANTED; and it is furtherORDERED that the Joinder Motion is GRANTED only to the extent that it is seeking Trustee to be substituted as plaintiff as the real party in interest; and it is further ORDERED that the Motion to Remand is DENIED.

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Saturday, December 08, 2018
32 32 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492) Sun 12/09 1:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 12/08/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
31 31 order 01-Order Thu 12/06 2:05 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice. Service by BNC. Entered on 12/6/2018. (rhg)
Related: [-]
misc Adversary Closed Thu 12/06 2:08 PM
Adversary 17-04027 bem Closed (rhg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 18, 2018
30 30 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492) Mon 11/19 1:26 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 11/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
29 29 order 01-Order Fri 11/16 11:16 AM
Order to disburse registry funds in the amount of $15,478.04 plus all accrued interest, minus any statutory users fees payable to Thomas D. Richardson, Trustee for Linda Proctor Manton. Service by BNC. Entered on 11/16/2018. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 28
Friday, November 09, 2018
28 28 misc Status Report Fri 11/09 10:43 AM
Status Report Motion for Disbursement of Registry Funds Filed by Thomas D. Richardson on behalf of Thomas D. Richardson. (Richardson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
27 27 notice Notice Tue 08/21 3:37 PM
Notice of Filing Motion for Approval of Compromise and Settlement filed by Thomas D. Richardson on behalf of Thomas D. Richardson. Hearing to be held on 9/26/2018 at 09:25 AM in Courtroom 342, Rome, (Richardson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
misc Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake Wed 08/01 10:45 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
26 26 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry (437) Thu 07/26 1:36 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry Notice Date 07/25/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
misc Hearing Wed 07/25 2:01 PM
STATUS HEARING HELD AND RESET TO 8/22/2018 at 09:25 AM in Courtroom 342, Rome, Related [+] (jmw)
Related: [-] 21
Monday, July 23, 2018
25 25 order Deposit Funds, Motion to Mon 07/23 12:19 PM
Consent Order Authorizing Deposit of Funds into the Court's Registry Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 7/23/2018. (slj)
Related: [-] 24
Friday, July 13, 2018
24 24 motion Deposit Funds into Court Registry, Motion to Fri 07/13 3:46 PM
Motion to Present Consent Order Authorizing Deposit of Funds into the Court's Registry filed by Thomas D. Richardson on behalf of Thomas D. Richardson. (Richardson, Thomas) Modified on 7/16/2018 (mrr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
23 23 court Notice of Leave of Absence Mon 05/14 4:22 PM
Notice of Leave of Absence from May 28, 2018, through June 8, 2018. (fmf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 06, 2018
22 22 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Mon 05/07 1:16 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 05/06/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
21 21 3 pgs notice Order and Notice Fri 05/04 3:15 PM
Order and Notice of Status Conference. Service by BNC. Entered on 5/4/2018. Hearing to be held on 7/24/2018 at 09:25 AM in Courtroom 342, Rome, Related [+] (mrr)
Related: [-] 1
Saturday, March 31, 2018
20 20 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Sun 04/01 2:23 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 03/31/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
19 19 1 pgs notice Order and Notice Thu 03/29 4:11 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from the Honorable Mary Grace Diehl to the Honorable Barbara Ellis-Monro. Service by BNC. (asb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
18 18 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Intervene Sat 03/03 1:32 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Intervene Notice Date 03/02/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
17 17 order Intervene, Motion to Wed 02/28 12:57 PM
Order (I) GRANTING Trustee's Motion to Intervene Related [+] Service by BNC, DENYING First Bank of Dalton's Motion to Remand Service by BNC, GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Substitute the Trustee as the Plaintiff Service by BNC. Entered on 2/28/2018. (mrr)
Related: [-] 3 9 12
Wednesday, November 08, 2017
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 11/08 1:45 PM
Joint Status Report (Defendants' and Chapter 7 Trustee's Joint Status Report and Response to First Bank of Dalton's Status Report) Filed by Leon S. Jones on behalf of Linda Proctor Manton, Thomas Manton, Manton Family Partnership, LLLP, TLM Diversified, LLC. (Jones, Leon)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2017
15 15 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Conference Mon 11/06 5:04 PM
Report on Status Conference Filed by James A. Fields on behalf of First Bank of Dalton. (Fields, James) Modified on 11/7/2017 (mrr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
14 14 answer Response to Motion Tue 09/19 5:01 PM
Objection to Defendants' Joinder of Chapter 7 Trustees Motion to Intervene and Defendants' Motion: (A) To Substitute Chapter 7 Trustee as Plaintiff as Real Party in Interest, (B) To Dismiss Claims by First Bank of Dalton, and (C) To Set Aside First Bank of Dalton's Default Judgment as Void Ab Initio filed by James A. Fields on behalf of First Bank of Dalton. Related [+](Fields, James) Modified on 9/20/2017 (mrr)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
13 13 misc Brief Tue 09/05 5:02 PM
Brief in Support of Defendants' Joinder of Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to Intervene and Defendants' Motion: (A) to Substitute Chapter 7 Trustee as Plaintiff as Real Party In Interest, (B) to Dismiss Claims by First Bank Of Dalton, and (C) to Set Aside First Bank of Dalton's Default Judgment as Void Ab Initio Filed by Leon S. Jones on behalf of Linda Proctor Manton, Thomas Manton, Manton Family Partnership, LLLP, TLM Diversified, LLC. Related [+] (Jones, Leon)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 motion Substitute Party, Motion to Tue 09/05 4:54 PM
Defendants' Joinder of Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to Intervene and Defendants' Motion: (A) to Substitute Chapter 7 Trustee as Plaintiff as Real Party In Interest, (B) to Dismiss Claims by First Bank Of Dalton, and (C) to Set Aside First Bank of Dalton's Default Judgment as Void Ab Initio filed by Leon S. Jones on behalf of Linda Proctor Manton, Thomas Manton, Manton Family Partnership, LLLP, TLM Diversified, LLC. Related [+] (Jones, Leon) Modified on 9/6/2017 (mrr)
Related: [-] 3
11 11 answer Response to Motion Tue 09/05 4:22 PM
Defendants' Response in Opposition to Motion of First Bank of Dalton to Remand to the Superior Court of Catoosa County, Georgia and/or for Abstention filed by Leon S. Jones on behalf of Linda Proctor Manton, Thomas Manton, Manton Family Partnership, LLLP, TLM Diversified, LLC. Related [+](Jones, Leon) Modified on 9/6/2017 (mrr)
Related: [-] 9
Saturday, August 19, 2017
10 10 motion Remand, Motion to Sat 08/19 1:32 PM
Motion to Remand Brief in Support filed by James A. Fields on behalf of First Bank of Dalton. Related [+] (Fields, James)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Remand, Motion to Sat 08/19 1:30 PM
Motion to Remand to Superior Court of Catossa County Georgia and/or Abstention filed by James A. Fields on behalf of First Bank of Dalton. (Fields, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
8 8 misc Jury Demand Thu 08/17 5:17 PM
Jury Demand Filed by Leslie M. Pineyro on behalf of Linda Proctor Manton, Thomas Manton, Manton Family Partnership, LLLP, TLM Diversified, LLC. (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice Thu 08/17 5:15 PM
Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027(e)(3) Filed by Leslie M. Pineyro on behalf of Linda Proctor Manton, Thomas Manton, Manton Family Partnership, LLLP, TLM Diversified, LLC. (Pineyro, Leslie) Modified on 8/18/2017 (srw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
6 6 notice Notice Tue 08/15 3:45 PM
Notice of Rule 9027 (e) Statement filed by James A. Fields on behalf of First Bank of Dalton. (Fields, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/15 10:34 AM
Amended Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Fields on behalf of First Bank of Dalton. (Fields, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/08 4:12 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Fields on behalf of First Bank of Dalton. (Fields, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
3 3 motion Intervene, Motion to Mon 08/07 4:32 PM
Motion to Intervene of Chapter 7 Trustee in Bankruptcy together with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Thomas D. Richardson on behalf of Thomas D. Richardson. (Richardson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2017
2 2 crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Thu 08/03 4:52 PM
Receipt of Notice of Removal 17-04027 [notice,32] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 45540934. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 08/03 4:51 PM
Adversary proceeding 17-04027 Notice of Removal 13 Related [+] Filed by First Bank of Dalton (Pineyro, Leslie)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex B - Verification
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex - Summons
Att: 3 Exhibit EX D - Summons
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex A - Petition of First Bank of Dalton
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex E - Summons
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex F - Summons
Att: 7 Exhibit Notice of Lis Pendens
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex h - Notice of Lis Pendens
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex I - Motion for TRO & Brief
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex J - Certificate of Compliance
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex K - Order Granting TRO
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex L - Entry of Service
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex M - Entry of Service
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex N - Entry of Service
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex O - Entry of Non Service
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex P - Certificate of Service
Att: 17 Exhibit Ex Q - Affidavit of Service
Att: 18 Exhibit EX R - Consent Order
Att: 19 Exhibit Ex S - Answer of Defendants
Att: 20 Exhibit Ex T - Receipt of Payment into Court
Att: 21 Exhibit Ex U - Leave of Absence (Bledsoe)
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit V (Withrock)
Att: 23 Exhibit Ex W - Order Striking Answer
Att: 24 Exhibit Ex X - Leave of Absence (Bledsoe)
Att: 25 Exhibit Ex Y - Notice of Hearing on Damages
Att: 26 Exhibit Ex Z - Certificate of Service of Order Striking Answer