New Jersey District Court
Judge:Stanley R Chesler
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:17-cv-05757
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2017
Terminated:Jul 18, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2018 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA
Represented By
RICHARD A. EDLIN
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
YANGHO CHARLES SHIN
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
DAVID JAY
Greenberg Taurig, LLP
contact info
ERIC DAVID WONG
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Plaintiff
ERMIAS BETURE
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ELISHA POLOMSKI
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES SAMUELSON
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
EMMANUEL EJIM
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
REMIGIUSZ ZUBER
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
RAYMOND PAGE
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
PHILLIP MITCHELL
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
DEREK LOGIUDICE
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
CORRIE KASAL
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
JERRY HUNG
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
HUGH HOLNESS
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
EZRA GETZLER
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
ERICA DUBOSE
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
DEBRA CROWNOVER
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info
Plaintiff Consolidated
MICHELLE BARNETT
Represented By
GARY S. GRAIFMAN
Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, Esqs.
contact info

GPO Mar 27 2018
OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 03/27/2018. (ek)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
45 45 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 07/19 2:29 PM
ORDER granting26 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Litigation by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, and it is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall mark this matter CLOSED. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/18/2018. (JB, )
Related: [-]
44 44 23 pgs order Opinion Thu 07/19 2:26 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/18/2018. (JB, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 07/19 2:30 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (JB, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
43 43 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Wed 05/23 5:35 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA re26 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Litigation (JAY, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/22 2:56 PM
NOTICE by MICHELLE BARNETT, ERMIAS BETURE, DEBRA CROWNOVER, ERICA DUBOSE, EMMANUEL EJIM, EZRA GETZLER, HUGH HOLNESS, JERRY HUNG, CORRIE KASAL, DEREK LOGIUDICE, PHILLIP MITCHELL, RAYMOND PAGE, ELISHA POLOMSKI, JAMES SAMUELSON, REMIGIUSZ ZUBER OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Jones v. Samsung Elcs. Am. Opinion,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 26, 2018
41 41 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/27 4:54 PM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER that Defendant's reply brief in further support of the Motion shall be filed on or before May 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/26/2018. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
40 40 misc Letter Wed 04/25 4:15 PM
Letter from Defendant Samsung requesting a Consent Order Extending Time to Reply to Motion to Compel Arbitration.(WONG, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Stipulation & Consent Order)
Monday, April 23, 2018
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/23 5:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MICHELLE BARNETT, ERMIAS BETURE, DEBRA CROWNOVER, ERICA DUBOSE, EMMANUEL EJIM, EZRA GETZLER, HUGH HOLNESS, JERRY HUNG, CORRIE KASAL, DEREK LOGIUDICE, PHILLIP MITCHELL, RAYMOND PAGE, ELISHA POLOMSKI, JAMES SAMUELSON, REMIGIUSZ ZUBER re26 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Litigation (GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Nicholas Migliaccio,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Screenshots of EULA,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Compendium of Plaintiffs Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Email of Gary S. Graifman Requesting Discovery,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Letter of Eric Wong Dated April 3, 2018,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Box and Packaging Produced by Defendant,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 19, 2018
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/19 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW W. FERICH on behalf of MICHELLE BARNETT, ERMIAS BETURE, DEBRA CROWNOVER, ERICA DUBOSE, EMMANUEL EJIM, EZRA GETZLER, HUGH HOLNESS, JERRY HUNG, CORRIE KASAL, DEREK LOGIUDICE, PHILLIP MITCHELL, RAYMOND PAGE, ELISHA POLOMSKI, JAMES SAMUELSON, REMIGIUSZ ZUBER (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
37 37 3 pgs order Order Tue 03/27 3:30 PM
ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 03/27/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
36 36 3 pgs order Opinion Tue 03/27 3:29 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 03/27/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Stipulation and Order Tue 03/27 1:06 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs opposition to the Motion shall be filed on or before April 23, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 03/26/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Tue 03/27 1:53 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee as to Nicholas Migliaccio, Esq., Jason Rathod, Esq., and Esfand Nafisi, Esq. : $ 450, receipt number NEW035996. (ek)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Tue 03/27 1:56 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, NICHOLAS A. MIGLIACCIO, Jason Rathod and Esfand Nafisi, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ek)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
qc QC - Pro Hac Vice request Mon 03/26 4:01 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by GARY GRAIFMAN on 03/01/2018 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (ek)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
34 34 misc Letter Fri 03/23 11:41 AM
Letter from Gary Graifman.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 01, 2018
33 33 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 03/01 3:52 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Esfand Nafisi to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 03/01 3:51 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jason Rathod to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 03/01 3:50 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Nicholas Migliaccio to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
30 30 order Stipulation and Order Wed 02/28 9:15 AM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER that Plaintiffs' opposition to the Motion shall be filed on or before March 23, 2018; Samsung's reply in further support of the Motion shall be due on or before April 23, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 02/27/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
29 29 misc Letter Mon 02/26 2:06 PM
Letter from Gary S. Graifman.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
28 28 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/14 3:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA identifying Samsung Electronics Co. LTD as Corporate Parent.. (JAY, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
27 27 order Stipulation and Order Wed 02/14 12:10 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the deadline for Defendant to answer, move pursuant to Rule 12(b), or otherwise plead in response to the Consolidated Amended Complaint is extended until fourteen (14) days after the Court enters an Order deciding Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/13/2018. (ld, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/13 9:09 AM
Set Deadlines as to26 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Litigation . Motion set for 3/19/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
26 26 motion Compel Mon 02/12 9:49 PM
First MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay of Litigation by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA.(JAY, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certification Maxine Dawson-Haney,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Saturday, February 10, 2018
25 25 misc Letter Sat 02/10 10:45 AM
Letter from Defendant Samsung Electronic America requesting extension of time to respond to consolidated amended complaint.(JAY, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
24 24 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/30 9:10 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that Samsung shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint on or before February 12, 2018; Plaintiffs' opposition to any motion in lieu of answer by Samsung shall be due forty (40) days from the filing of such motion, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 01/29/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 01/30 9:12 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document23 Letter submitted by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 02/12/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
23 23 misc Letter Fri 01/26 6:12 PM
Letter from Samsung Electronics America with Stipulation. (WONG, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/17 9:10 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas A. Migliaccio, Jason S. Rathod and Esfand Y. Nafisi, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 01/12/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
21 21 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 01/09 4:59 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by MICHELLE BARNETT, ERMIAS BETURE, DEBRA CROWNOVER, ERICA DUBOSE, EMMANUEL EJIM, EZRA GETZLER, HUGH HOLNESS, JERRY HUNG, CORRIE KASAL, DEREK LOGIUDICE, PHILLIP MITCHELL, RAYMOND PAGE, ELISHA POLOMSKI, JAMES SAMUELSON, REMIGIUSZ ZUBER re19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Attorney: Gary S. Graifman.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
20 20 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Tue 01/02 4:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA re19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Attorney: Gary S. Graifman.(JAY, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 26, 2017
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/26 9:52 AM
Set Deadlines as to19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Attorney: Gary S. Graifman.. Motion set for 1/16/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2017
19 19 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 12/22 4:02 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Attorney: Gary S. Graifman. by MICHELLE BARNETT, ERMIAS BETURE, DEBRA CROWNOVER, ERICA DUBOSE, EMMANUEL EJIM, EZRA GETZLER, HUGH HOLNESS, JERRY HUNG, CORRIE KASAL, DEREK LOGIUDICE, PHILLIP MITCHELL, RAYMOND PAGE, ELISHA POLOMSKI, JAMES SAMUELSON, REMIGIUSZ ZUBER.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration of Benjamin F. Johns,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Johns Declaration,
Att: 4 Declaration of Gary S. Graifman,
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Graifman Declaration,
Att: 6 Declaration of Nicholas A. Migliaccio,
Att: 7 Exhibit A to Migliaccio Declaration,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 9 Certificate of Service
Friday, December 15, 2017
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/15 6:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, ERICA DUBOSE, EMMANUEL EJIM, EZRA GETZLER, JERRY HUNG, CORRIE KASAL, DEREK LOGIUDICE, PHILLIP MITCHELL, REMIGIUSZ ZUBER, MICHELLE BARNETT, DEBRA CROWNOVER, RAYMOND PAGE, HUGH HOLNESS, filed by ERMIAS BETURE, JAMES SAMUELSON, ELISHA POLOMSKI.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/15 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN F. JOHNS on behalf of ERMIAS BETURE, ELISHA POLOMSKI, JAMES SAMUELSON (JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/07 2:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas A. Migliaccio, Jason S. Rathod and Esfand Y. Nafisi by ERMIAS BETURE, ELISHA POLOMSKI, JAMES SAMUELSON.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Gary S. Graifman in support of PHV for Nicholas A. Migliaccio,
Att: 2 Declaration of Nicholas A. Migliaccio,
Att: 3 Certification of Gary S. Graifman in support of PHV for Jason S. Rathod,
Att: 4 Declaration of Jason S. Rathod,
Att: 5 Certification of Gary S. Graifman in support of PHV for Esfand Y. Nafisi,
Att: 6 Declaration of Esfand Y. Nafisi,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/07 3:22 PM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas A. Migliaccio, Jason S. Rathod and Esfand Y. Nafisi . Motion set for 1/2/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2017
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Mon 12/04 9:46 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint in the Beture action on or before December 15, 2017. Samsung shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint within forty-five (45) days after the filing of the Consolidated Amended Complaintby Plaintiffs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/1/2017. (ld, )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Fri 12/01 11:59 AM
Letter from Gary S. Graifman.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation
Thursday, November 02, 2017
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Thu 11/02 11:12 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER consolidating claims in the Beture and Barnett actions; The Clerk is instructed to administratively close Barnett v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. civil action No. (17-cv-6828). Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated amended complaint in the Beture action not later than (30) days from the date of this Order, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/01/2017. (ek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by YANGHO CHARLES SHIN on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA (SHIN, YANGHO)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD A. EDLIN on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA (EDLIN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC DAVID WONG on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA (WONG, ERIC)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID JAY on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA (JAY, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 10/25 4:27 PM
STIPULATION -- Joint Stipulation Regarding Consolidation and the Filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint by ERMIAS BETURE, ELISHA POLOMSKI, JAMES SAMUELSON. (JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/20 3:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, filed by ERMIAS BETURE, JAMES SAMUELSON, ELISHA POLOMSKI.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
6 6 order Stipulation and Order Thu 09/14 8:51 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER, Plaintiff anticipate that he will amend the Complaint, no respond to the Complaint by Samsung is necessary. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before 9/20/2017. Samsung shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 10/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/13/2017. (JB, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
5 5 misc Stipulation Tue 09/05 6:16 PM
STIPULATION of All Parties Setting Dates for filing of Amended Complaint and Responses by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA. (WONG, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/22 4:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERMIAS BETURE, JAMES SAMUELSON, ELISHA POLOMSKI. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA served on 8/16/2017, answer due 9/6/2017.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, August 07, 2017
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/07 9:57 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *ELISAVETA KALLUCI* (ek)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2017
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/04 4:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERMIAS BETURE, ELISHA POLOMSKI, JAMES SAMUELSON. (GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/04 4:44 PM
COMPLAINT against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8008319) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ERMIAS BETURE, JAMES SAMUELSON, ELISHA POLOMSKI.(GRAIFMAN, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/04 11:05 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
Related: [-]