New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:17-cv-05132
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2017
Terminated:Sep 12, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 03, 2018 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
Rhapsody International, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Michael Armstrong
Offit Kurman, P.A. (pa)
contact info
April Michelle Rancier
Schwartz & Perry
contact info
Plaintiff
Bryan Eich
Represented By
Richard M Garbarini
Garbarini Fitzgerald P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
18 18 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Wed 09/13 12:22 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) plaintiff hereby serves notice that the above-captioned matter is dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/13/217) (ras)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted Wed 09/13 10:06 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/12/2017 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/12 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) Rhapsody International, Inc.. Document filed by Bryan Eich. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 08/17 5:47 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline to answer is hereby extended to September 15, 2017. No further extensions. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 08/17 11:32 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Motion or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joseph M. Armstrong, Esquire dated August 17, 2017. Document filed by Rhapsody International, Inc..(Armstrong, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/11 8:37 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Joseph Michael Armstrong to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 08/11 8:32 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 11 CONSENT MOTION for Joseph Michael Armstrong to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14003177. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2017
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/10 6:18 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Rhapsody International, Inc., Corporate Parent RealNetworks Digital Music of California, Inc., Corporate Parent RealNetworks, Inc. for Rhapsody International, Inc.. Document filed by Rhapsody International, Inc..(Rancier, April)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/10 5:20 PM
CONSENT MOTION for Joseph Michael Armstrong to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14003177. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rhapsody International, Inc..(Armstrong, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joseph M. Armstrong,
Att: 2 Affidavit of April Rancier,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (NJ),
Att: 4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (PA),
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Tue 08/08 10:09 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney April Michelle Rancier to RE-FILE Document 10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2017
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/04 1:57 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate RealNetworks, Inc. for Rhapsody International, Inc.. Document filed by Rhapsody International, Inc..(Rancier, April)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/04 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by April Michelle Rancier on behalf of Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Rancier, April)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
8 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rhapsody International, Inc.. (rch)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 26, 2017, at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York, and as further set forth. (Initial Conference set for 9/26/2017 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/10/2017) (ras)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2017
6 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rhapsody International Inc. d/b/a NAPSTER, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Eich. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (kl)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted. (kl)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rhapsody International, Inc., Bryan Eich. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (kl)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (kl)
Related: [-]
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (kl)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (kl)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (kl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2017
4 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Rhapsody International Inc. d/b/a Rhapsody, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Bryan Eich. (Garbarini, Richard) Modified on 7/10/2017 (kl).
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Rhapsody International, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13872223)Document filed by Bryan Eich.(Garbarini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A