Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Gregory K Frizzell
Referred: Jodi F Jayne
Case #: 4:17-cv-00454
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2017
Terminated:Oct 31, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2018 2:45 AM CST
Defendant
Castle Hill Holding LLC
Represented By
Sherry H Flax
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (baltimore)
contact info
Duane H Zobrist
Zobrist Law Group PLLC
contact info
Matthew J Antonelli
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (dc)
contact info
Robert Courtney Gill
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (dc)
contact info
Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Zobrist Law Group PLLC
contact info
Thomas S Schaufelberger
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (dc)
contact info
James Collins Hodges
James C Hodges PC
contact info
Defendant
Castle Hill Studios LLC
Represented By
Sherry H Flax
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (baltimore)
contact info
Duane H Zobrist
Zobrist Law Group PLLC
contact info
Matthew J Antonelli
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (dc)
contact info
Robert Courtney Gill
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (dc)
contact info
Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Zobrist Law Group PLLC
contact info
Thomas S Schaufelberger
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (dc)
contact info
James Collins Hodges
James C Hodges PC
contact info
Defendant
Ironworks Development, LLC
Represented By
Sherry H Flax
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (baltimore)
contact info
Duane H Zobrist
Zobrist Law Group PLLC
contact info
Matthew J Antonelli
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (dc)
contact info
Robert Courtney Gill
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (dc)
contact info
Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Zobrist Law Group PLLC
contact info
Thomas S Schaufelberger
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr Llp (dc)
contact info
James Collins Hodges
James C Hodges PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Video Gaming Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Rebecca B Dalton
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr
Gable & Gotwals (tulsa)
contact info
Neil K Roman
Covington & Burlin Llp (ny)
contact info
Michael Sawyer
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Peter Swanson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Gary M Rubman
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Michael Sean Sawyer
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Peter Andrew Swanson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Rebecca Barret Dalton
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, November 01, 2019
424 424 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 5:07 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell REDACTED VERSION OF ORDER 373 pursuant to Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 423 Order,
423 423 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 5:06 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 390 Notice (Other),391 Notice (Other),373 Sealed Order
422 422 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 5:05 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell REDACTED VERSION OF ORDER 344 pursuant to Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 421 Order,
421 421 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 5:04 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 354 Notice (Other),344 Sealed Order,352 Notice (Other),
420 420 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 5:02 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell REDACTED VERSION OF ORDER 320 pursuant to Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 419 Order,
419 419 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 5:00 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 336 Notice (Other),338 Notice (Other),320 Sealed Order
418 418 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 4:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell REDACTED VERSION OF ORDER 316 pursuant to Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 417 Order,
417 417 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 4:50 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 333 Sealed Unredacted Version per Local Rule 5.3(b),331 Notice (Other),316 Sealed Order
416 416 order 01 - Order Documents - Unseal Document(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 1:54 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , unsealing document(s) Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 379 Sealed Order,394 Notice (Other),391 Notice (Other)
415 415 order 01 - Order Documents - Unseal Document(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 1:53 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , unsealing document(s) Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 377 Sealed Order,396 Notice (Other),
414 414 order 01 - Order Documents - Unseal Document(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 1:51 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , unsealing document(s) Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 376 Sealed Order,395 Notice (Other),
413 413 order 01 - Order Documents - Unseal Document(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 1:49 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , unsealing document(s) Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 375 Sealed Order,388 Notice (Other),
412 412 order 01 - Order Documents - Unseal Document(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 1:48 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , unsealing document(s) Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 345 Sealed Order,353 Notice (Other),
411 411 order 01 - Order Documents - Unseal Document(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 1:46 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , unsealing document(s) Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 322 Sealed Order,335 Notice (Other),334 Response
410 410 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Documents - Unseal Document(s) Fri 11/01 1:41 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , unsealing document(s) Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 387 Notice (Other),374 Sealed Order
409 409 misc Report on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks Fri 11/01 9:58 AM
REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (sac, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
408 408 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/31 5:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Video Gaming Technologies, Inc. (Rubman, Gary)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Fri 11/01 9:48 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated:385 OBJECTION to Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations of Testimony (Submitted as part of Plaintiff's Brief, Doc. 368 ) ) (see document number408 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]