Florida Southern District Court
Judge:K Michael Moore
Referred: Lurana S Snow
Case #: 0:17-cv-61558
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2017
Terminated:Feb 26, 2018
Last checked: Friday Feb 02, 2018 4:20 AM EST
Defendant
OneMain Financial Group, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas Steven Agnello
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
David Alan Elliott
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerald Paul
Represented By
Yechezkel Rodal
Rodal Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
17 17 order Order Wed 03/28 8:10 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon the Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice16 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Stipulation16 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the above-styled cause is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE this case. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/28/2018. (jm01)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline Wed 03/28 8:19 AM
Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: All Defendants. PER DE 17 (lbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/27 4:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice / Joint by OneMain Financial Group, LLC (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 02/26 10:02 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (mll)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
15 15 misc Status Report Wed 12/27 10:16 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by OneMain Financial Group, LLC (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
14 14 misc Status Report Wed 11/01 7:55 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by OneMain Financial Group, LLC (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2017
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 10/20 10:39 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Compel and to Stay Case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/20/2017. (bvr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
12 12 misc Status Report Thu 10/19 11:46 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by OneMain Financial Group, LLC (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/11 10:51 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by OneMain Financial Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent OneMain Financial Holdings, LLC for OneMain Financial Group, LLC (Elliott, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Compel Mon 09/11 10:43 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation, and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by OneMain Financial Group, LLC. Attorney David Alan Elliott added to party OneMain Financial Group, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/25/2017(Elliott, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph Orlando
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 08/29 9:20 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant's8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The Court cautions that this Motion violates Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) as it is not accompanied by a proposed order. However, despite Counsel's error, and UPON CONSIDERATION of the Unopposed Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant's8 Unopposed Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 11, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/29/2017. (bvr)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/29 9:28 AM
Set Deadlines OneMain Financial Group, LLC answer due 9/11/2017. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2017
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 08/28 2:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by OneMain Financial Group, LLC. (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 08/18 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Steven Agnello on behalf of OneMain Financial Group, LLC. Attorney Nicholas Steven Agnello added to party OneMain Financial Group, LLC(pty:dft). (Agnello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
6 6 order Order Tue 08/08 10:28 AM
GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 8/8/2017. (lan)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Judge Tue 08/08 9:38 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LURANA S. SNOW. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snows discovery procedures, which the parties shall be advised of by the entry of an Order. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/8/2017. (bvr)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Pretrial Order Tue 08/08 9:37 AM
PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuits Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/8/2017. (bvr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/07 8:11 AM
Summons Issued as to OneMain Financial Group, LLC. (rms1)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 06, 2017
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 08/07 8:10 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rms1)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against OneMain Financial Group, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9949107, filed by Jerald Paul.(Rodal, Yechezkel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)