Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-01204

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:17-ap-00586
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2017
Terminated:Mar 21, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Synchrony Bank, a federal savings bank, d/b/a Old Navy Credit Card
170 West Election Rd., Ste. 125
Draper, UT 84020
Represented By
Synchrony Bank, a federal savings bank, d/b/a Old Navy Credit Card
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12157 West Linebaugh Avenue PMB 401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash, Attorney for Trustee
Lash, Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/21 10:34 AM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-586 Closed. (Brenton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
11 11 order Virtual Order Administratively Closing Adversary Proceeding (TEXT ONLY) Tue 03/20 9:51 AM
Order Administratively Closing Adversary Proceeding. On March 2, 2017, the Court entered an order approving the parties' compromise or settlement agreement in this adversary proceeding, Doc. No. 9. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this adversary proceeding is administratively closed. This order is without prejudice to any party's moving to reopen the adversary proceeding for the purpose of seeking relief in connection with matters or disputes arising from or related to the compromise or settlement agreement. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Michael G. Williamson (text-only order). This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, March 05, 2018
10 10 misc Proof of Service Mon 03/05 6:54 PM
Proof of Service of Agreed Final Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Filed by Thomas A Lash, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Attorney for Trustee, Thomas)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, March 02, 2018
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Fri 03/02 2:38 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary with Prejudice Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash, Attorney for Trustee is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Schubert Kerkes, Deborah)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, March 01, 2018
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 03/01 12:24 PM
Joint Stipulation for Final Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Thomas A Lash, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Attorney for Trustee, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
7 7 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 02/20 3:58 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Vivian Elliott: Pltf Atty RULING: Cont. Pretrial Conference - Cont. to 5/23 @ 9:30 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
6 6 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 11/21 5:29 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Vivian Elliott: Pltf Atty RULING: Pretrial Conference - Cont. to 2/20/18 @ 9:30 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 07, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Sun 10/08 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
Thursday, October 05, 2017
4 4 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Thu 10/05 11:22 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/21/2017 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Nita)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, August 07, 2017
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 08/07 11:05 AM
Service Executed on Synchrony Bank d/b/a Old Navy Credit Card of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Attorney for Trustee, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 08/07 8:59 AM
Summons issued on Synchrony Bank d/b/a Old Navy Credit Card along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 09/06/2017. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Fri 08/04 2:42 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against Synchrony Bank d/b/a Old Navy Credit Card. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Attorney for Trustee, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet