Berg v. Monogram Residential Trust, Inc. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Levi Russell, III |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02231 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 03, 2018 4:57 AM EST |
Defendant
Mark T. Alfieri
|
|
Defendant
David D. Fitch
|
|
Defendant
GS Monarch Acquisition, LLC
|
|
Defendant
GS Monarch Parent, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tammy K. Jones
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan L. Kempner
|
|
Defendant
Monogram Residential Trust, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
W. Benjamin Moreland
|
|
Defendant
E. Alan Patton
|
|
Defendant
Timothy J. Pire
|
|
Defendant
Greystar Real Estate Partners
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Berg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MARGINAL ORDER approving4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Robert Berg. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/28/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Berg (Enright, Donald) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER directing Berg show cause within 10 days why the Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Federal Rule 4(m) and Local Rule 103.8(a). Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/13/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued 21 days as to Mark T. Alfieri, David D. Fitch, GS Monarch Acquisition, LLC, GS Monarch Parent, LLC, Greystar Real Estate Partners, Tammy K. Jones, Jonathan L. Kempner, Monogram Residential Trust, Inc., W. Benjamin Moreland, E. Alan Patton, Timothy J. Pire.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/08 10:38 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge J. Frederick Motz no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Mark T. Alfieri, David D. Fitch, GS Monarch Acquisition, LLC, GS Monarch Parent, LLC, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, Tammy K. Jones, Jonathan L. Kempner, Monogram Residential Trust, Inc., W. Benjamin Moreland, E. Alan Patton, Timothy J. Pire ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6818198.), filed by Robert Berg.(Enright, Donald) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |