Hawaii District Court
Judge:Leslie E Kobayashi
Referred: Kenneth J Mansfield
Case #: 1:17-cv-00389
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2017
Terminated:Mar 13, 2018
Last checked: Friday Feb 02, 2018 11:23 PM HST
Defendant
Doe Entities 1-10
Defendant
Jane Does 1-10
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Defendant
MasTec Network Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff
Kathryn Stilwell
Represented By
David F. Simons
The Law Offices Of David F. Simons
contact info
William N. Ota
Ota & Hara, Lllc
contact info
Leighton M. Hara
Ota & Hara Lllc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM HST
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
25 25 order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Tue 03/13 6:10 PM
STIPULATION For Dismissal With Prejudice Of All Claims And Parties and Order signed by JUDGE LESLIE. KOBAYASHI submitted on behalf of Kathryn Stilwell in CV 17-00389 LEK-KJM. Entered in Lead Case: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM although captioned and identified only as to CIV NO. 17-00389 LEK-KJM Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM (eps, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
24 24 order Stipulation for Dismissal and Order Thu 03/08 5:02 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal With Prejudice Of All Claims And All Parties and Order signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI, submitted on behalf of Plaintiffsy Roy Mumey, Kathryn Stilwell in CIV 16-00575 LEK-KJM. Entered in Associated Case: 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM although captioned and identified only as to CIV NO. 16-00575 LEK-KJM (eps, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
23 23 service Certificate of Service Wed 01/10 1:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC, Paul E. Troy, Jr [Re: Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination [Roy Mumey] Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Certificate of Service Wed 01/10 1:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC, Paul E. Troy, Jr [Re: Amended Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination [Kathryn Stilwell] Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/08 7:08 AM
WITHDRAWAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF ROY MUMEY'S "PARNAR" PUBLIC POLICY CLAIM [ECF NO. 57] NOTICE by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC, Paul E. Troy, Jr re (57 in 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Roy Mumey's "Parnar" Public Policy Claim Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Defendants' Motion MasTec Network Solutions, LLC, Paul E. Troy, Jr.Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew) Docket Text Modified on 1/8/2018 (eps, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
20 20 service Certificate of Service Wed 12/13 2:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC, Paul E. Troy, Jr [Re: Defendant's Second Offer of Judgment [Roy Mumey] Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Certificate of Service Wed 12/13 2:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC, Paul E. Troy, Jr [Re: Defendant's Second Offer of Judgment [Kathryn Stilwell] Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
18 18 respm Concise Statement of Facts Mon 11/27 3:11 PM
CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts re (63 in 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC, Paul E. Troy, Jr.Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Holly Stiver,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Certificate of Service
17 17 motion Partial Summary Judgment Mon 11/27 3:02 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Andrew L. Pepper appearing for Defendants MasTec Network Solutions, LLC, Paul E. Troy, JrAssociated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
16 16 service Certificate of Service Tue 10/31 8:03 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC [Re: Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination of Deponent: Plaintiff Roy Mumey] Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Tue 10/31 8:02 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC [Re: Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Oral Examination of Deponent: Plaintiff Kathryn Stilwell] Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 10/26 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (57 in 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 11 in 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Roy Mumey's "Parnar" Public Policy Claim : Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2018 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(wnn, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Certificate of Service Thu 10/26 1:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC [Re: Defendants' Offer of Judgment [Roy Mumey]] Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Certificate of Service Thu 10/26 1:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MasTec Network Solutions, LLC [Re: Defendants' Offer of Judgment [Kathryn Stilwell]] Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Thu 10/26 1:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Roy Mumey's "Parnar" Public Policy Claim Andrew L. Pepper appearing for Defendant MasTec Network Solutions, LLCAssociated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM(Pepper, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
10 10 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/20 12:14 PM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 09/20/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-LEK-KJM (eps, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes Link 1 - Terminate Hearings Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Wed 09/20 10:45 AM
EO: In light of the7 Stipulation to Consolidate Related Cases, Court issues similar dates as previously issued in 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM. This Court also VACATES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/02/2017. Dates areas follows: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 11/06/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 09/25/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 08/06/2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 06/06/2018. Discovery due by 09/07/2018. Court to prepare a Rule 16 Scheduling Order. (Magistrate Judge KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2017
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 09/18 8:44 AM
Order Reassigning Case. Please reflect new case number CV 17-00389 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings ). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/15/17. (cib, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2017
7 7 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 09/15 1:54 PM
STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES AND ORDER. Signed by JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 09/15/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00575-LEK-KJM, 1:17-cv-00389-SOM-KJM IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the SM Parties and the MasTec Parties, through their respective counsel of record herein, that the ADA action be consolidated with the SM action and assigned to the Honorable Leslie E. Kobayashi for all purposes (eps, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
6 6 misc Civil Waiver of Service Packet Mon 08/07 3:53 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (emt, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons,
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons
5 5 order Order Setting Rule 16 Mon 08/07 3:50 PM
Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 10/2/2017 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/7/2017. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 08/07 3:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Mastec Network Solutions, LLC. (emt, )
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 08/07 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 17-00389 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings . (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 08/07 2:58 PM
CIVIL Cover Sheet by Kathryn Stilwell. (Hara, Leighton)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/07 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons against Mastec Network Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1909449.), filed by Kathryn Stilwell.(Hara, Leighton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Demand for Jury,
Att: 2 Summons