Knight Energy Holdings, LLC, et al
Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John W Kolwe |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-51014 |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2019 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Knight Energy Holdings, LLC
2727 SE Evangeline Trwy
Lafayette, LA 70508-2205 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
DIP
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101 |
1. | Knight Energy emerges from Chapter 11 bankruptcy (theadvertiser.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/14/2017 | |
2. | Knight Energy Holdings files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (theadvocate.com) |
Submitted Thu 08/10/2017 | |