Oregon District Court
Judge:Anna J Brown
Case #: 3:14-cv-00040
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2014
Terminated:May 21, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 9:27 AM PST
Defendant
DBV Distribution, Inc.
Represented By
Michael K. Heilbronner
Idea Legal, PC
contact info
Defendant
Dragon Bleu, Sarl
Represented By
Michael K. Heilbronner
Idea Legal, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nike, Inc.
Represented By
Erik S. Maurer
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
contact info
Christopher J. Renk
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
contact info
Aaron P. Bowling
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Michael J. Harris
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
contact info
Janice V. Mitrius
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Jon P. Stride
Tonkon Torp LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 28, 2014
27 27 (CORRECTED)Patent Report: Closing Report. (bb) Modified on 5/28/2014 (bb).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 27, 2014
26 26 Patent Report: Closing report. (bb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2014
25 25 Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Nike, Inc. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2014
24 24 Notice of mailing from USPS to Dragon Bleu, SARL regarding18 (ecp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2014
23 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Dragon Bleu, Sarl. (Heilbronner, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Dragon Bleu, Sarl. (Heilbronner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2014
21 21 Exhibits , Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by DBV Distribution, Inc.. (Heilbronner, Michael)
Related: [-]
20 20 Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by DBV Distribution, Inc.. (Heilbronner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2014
19 19 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,4 upon Dragon Bleu, Sarl served on 1/20/2014 (served via U.S. Postal Office, Global Express Guaranteed) Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, January 24, 2014
18 18 Clerk's Notice of Delivery to USPS on 1/24/2014. Translated and English copies of Complaint1 , Case Assignment and Scheduling Order3 , and Summons Issued4 for foreign service upon defendant Dragon Bleu, Sarl. (sss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2014
17 17 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Harris for Nike, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3554378 issued. Signed on 1/21/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
Related: [-]
16 16 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik S. Maurer for Nike, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3554431 issued. Signed on 1/21/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp) Modified on 1/23/2014 to correct file date(ecp).
Related: [-]
15 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erik S. Maurer . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3554431. Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
14 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Harris . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3554378. Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2014
13 13 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron P. Bowling for Nike, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3546215 issued. Signed on 1/16/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
Related: [-]
12 12 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Janice V. Mitrius for Nike, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3546205 issued. Signed on 1/16/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
Related: [-]
11 11 Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Renk for Nike, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3546193 issued. Signed on 1/16/2014 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
Related: [-]
10 10 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart to Judge Anna J. Brown. (eo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2014
9 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron P. Bowling . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3546215. Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
8 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Janice V. Mitrius . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3546205. Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
7 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher J. Renk . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3546193. Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2014
6 6 Summons Returned Executed. as to DBV Distribution, Inc. served on 1/10/2014, answer due on 1/31/2014 Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2014
5 5 Trademark Report : This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought. (eo)
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to DBV Distribution, Inc., Dragon Bleu, Sarl. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (eo)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 5/9/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/9/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 6/9/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (eo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2014
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
1 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3540882 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 2969824--7/19/2005--Nike, Inc.. Filed by Nike, Inc. against All Defendants. (Stride, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons