New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:14-cv-00090
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause42:4001 National Insurance Flood Act
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2014
Terminated:May 08, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Dec 06, 2014 1:20 AM EST
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Co.
Represented By
Deani Beard Milano
Nielsen, Carter & Treas, LLC
contact info
Rosa M. Feeney
Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles LLP
contact info
James P. Lagios
Iseman, Cunningham, Riester & Hyde, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Frank Guglielmelli
Represented By
Shawn Jared Wallach
Speights & Worrich, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jocelyn Guglielmelli
Represented By
Shawn Jared Wallach
Speights & Worrich, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2014
53 53 CORRECTED ORDER: Pursuant to Case Management Order Number 1 ("CMO 1"), the parties were Ordered to submit a Notice of Arbitration in accordance with Local Rule 83.7, or alternatively, to submit a stipulation consenting to mediation, within 14 days of the completion of expedited discovery. (CMO 1 at 10, see also CMO 1, Exs. C, D). To ease administration and assignment of these cases, counsel in all Hurricane Sandy Cases are hereby Ordered to submit copies of any stipulations for mediation and arbitration to Liaison Counsel by 5/22/14 , and to indicate on such stipulations whether the parties are seeking to use private mediators or the Court's mediation program. To further assist the Court, Liaison Counsel is directed to compile a list of these stipulations, and to designate on such list whether the parties in a particular case seek to engage in arbitration or mediation, and whether they have noted an intention to use a private mediator in lieu of the Court's mediation program. Liaison Counsel is directed to submit the list to the Court by 6/6/14 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak, Magistrate Judge Gary Brown, and Magisrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 5/9/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-mc-00041-CLP-GRB-RER et al. (Caggiano, Diana) (Main Document 370 replaced on 5/9/2014) (Caggiano, Diana). Modified on 5/9/2014 (Caggiano, Diana). Modified on 5/9/2014 (Caggiano, Diana).
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2014
52 52 STIPULATION of Discontinuance without Predjudice and Remand by Allstate Insurance Co. (Lagios, James)
Related: [-]
NOTICE by the Clerk: Recently, law firms have been filing documents, such as motions for an extension of time to file an answer, on the Lead case (14 MC 0041) and not spreading the entry to their individual member case(s). They are also adding the Party to the lead case because their party is not available on the Select the Party drop down list. If you docket the motion on the lead case and spread only to the individual member case(s), your party will appear on the Select the Party drop down list with the following format (Name of Party/Member Case Docket Number/Party Role). This is important because it sets important deadlines for the individual cases. Any new added parties have been deleted from the lead case. Under no circumstances should you add the party on the lead case. Also, you should only spread to the individual member cases and not ALL member cases. Associated Cases: 1:14-mc-00041-CLP-GRB-RER et al. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
ORDER re52 Stipulation filed by Allstate Insurance Co. The stipulation of partial dismissal and remand to state court is hereby SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to remand and close the case. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/8/2014. (Keefe, Reed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2014
ORDER finding as moot44 Motion for Disclosure. The motion for disclosure is found to be moot in light of today's telephone conference (see Minute Entry dated 5/7/2014). Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/7/2014. (Keefe, Reed)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto:Telephone Conference held on 5/7/2014. Antonio Smith for plaintiffs; Rosa Feeney and James Lagios for defendant. Plaintiffs have advised defendant that the damage in this case solely related to wind falls below the threshold for federal jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. The parties intend to submit a stipulation dismissing those claims related to flood damage without prejudice and remanding the wind-related claims to state court. The stipulation shall be filed by close of business, tomorrow, May 8, 2014, for the court's review. Mr. Smith shall file a notice of appearance forthwith. (Keefe, Reed)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2014
51 51 Letter Letter to Judges requesting an extension of time by Jared T. Greisman Associated Cases: 1:14-mc-00041-CLP-GRB-RER et al. (Greisman, Jared)
Related: [-]
50 50 MODIFICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1: CMO 1 is modified to permit information exchanged after April 21, 2014 (the deadline for the first phase of automatic discovery required under CMO 1) to be used during case mediations. (See CMO 1 at 6-9). Additionally, defendants request for additional time to provide the Sandy Subcommittee with a list of cases for early settlement is granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/2/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-mc-00041-CLP-GRB-RER et al. (Weissman, Eve) Modified on 5/2/2014 (Weissman, Eve).
Related: [-]
49 49 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 5: By May 15, 2014 , defendants are directed to provide the Court with a list of the commonly occurring deficiencies in discovery that defendants have identified and believe will prevent meaningful settlement discussions, along with a list of the docket numbers of the cases in which each such problem has occurred. To the extent that plaintiffs are aware of any of these deficiencies occurring in their own cases, they should take the necessary steps to immediately remedy such deficiencies. See attached Order for details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/2/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-mc-00041-CLP-GRB-RER et al. (Weissman, Eve) Modified on 5/2/2014 (Weissman, Eve).
Related: [-]