Lawrence v. American Express
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-43239
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-43239
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Russell F Nelms |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-04095 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
American Express
1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mitchell Lawrence, Plan Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
court
Close adversary case
Tue 01/02 9:56 AM
Adversary case 4:17-ap-4095 closed (Blanco, J.) |
||
Sunday, December 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order granting motion to dismiss adversary proceeding with prejudice Entered on 12/15/2017. (Kucera, J.) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WITH PREJUDICE filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Lawrence (Platt, Mark) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons service executed on American Express 8/11/2017 (Crooks, David) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 1/8/2018 at 01:30 PM at Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm.. Entered on 8/10/2017 (McCrory, J.) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons issued on American Express Answer Due 9/11/2017 (McCrory, J.) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 17-04095 Complaint by Mitchell Lawrence against American Express. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 . 14. 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Crooks, David) |