Lawrence v. Fine Line Production
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-43239
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-43239
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Russell F Nelms |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-04098 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Fine Line Production, Defendant
2221 Regal Parkway
Euless, TX 76040 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mitchell Lawrence, Plan Trustee
5420 LBJ Fwy., Suite 1200
Dallas, TX 75240 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:10 PM CDT |
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
court
Close adversary case
Fri 05/25 9:07 AM
Adversary case 4:17-ap-4098 closed (Blanco, J.) |
||
Saturday, May 12, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order dismissing case without prejudice. Entered on 5/10/2018 (Kucera, J.) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
court
Hearing held
Mon 01/08 4:18 PM
Hearing held on 1/8/2018. ***SETTLED - INDEFINITE CONTINUANCE*** (Levario, Tandi) |
||
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Witness and Exhibit List filed by Defendant Fine Line Production . (Stasio, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law filed by Defendant Fine Line Production . (Stasio, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons service executed on Fine Line Production 8/11/2017 (Crooks, David) Modified service date on 8/29/2017 (Tello, Chris) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Answer to complaint filed by Fine Line Production. (Stasio, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call . Trial Docket Call date set for 1/8/2018 at 01:30 PM at Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm.. Entered on 8/10/2017 (McCrory, J.) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons issued on Fine Line Production Answer Due 9/11/2017 (McCrory, J.) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 17-04098 Complaint by Mitchell Lawrence against Fine Line Production. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 . 14. 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Crooks, David) |