Schmidt v. Gaubert Oil Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-34287
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-34287
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-03353 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gaubert Oil Company, Inc.
10 Rienzi Drive
Thibodaux, LA 70301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Schmidt
Black Elk Litigation Trust c/o Okin Adams LLP 1113 Vine St., Ste. 201
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 11/29 10:19 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3353 Closed. (adol) |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Thu 11/09 10:24 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Against Gaubert Oil Company, Inc. Filed by Richard Schmidt (Okin, Matthew) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 10/27 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/25 2:10 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 10/25/2017 Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2017 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (adol) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time
Tue 10/10 4:42 PM
Motion to Extend Time Assented Motion to (I) Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, (II) Continue Rule 7016 Conference and (III) Stay all Deadlines Filed by Gaubert Oil Company, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2017 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Bishop, Micheal) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate
Fri 09/22 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service of Scheduling Order (Filed By Richard Schmidt ) (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate
Fri 09/22 12:38 PM
Certificate of Service for Complaint and Summons (Filed By Richard Schmidt ) (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/14 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 09/11 4:29 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 9/11/2017 Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2017 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (adol) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/08 10:21 AM
Summons Issued on Gaubert Oil Company, Inc. Date Issued 9/8/2017. (wbos) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 09/07 3:17 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Gaubert Oil Company, Inc. (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 08/15 10:19 AM
Summons Issued on Gaubert Oil Company, Inc. Date Issued 8/15/2017. (hcar) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 08/10 9:52 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Gaubert Oil Company, Inc.. (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 08/09 4:23 PM
Adversary case 17-03353 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers by Richard Schmidt against Gaubert Oil Company, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Okin, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet for Gaubert Oil Company, Inc |