Schmidt v. R&R Energy Services LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-34287
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-34287
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-03357 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
R&R Energy Services LLC
269 Gabasse Street
Houma, LA 70360 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Schmidt
Black Elk Litigation Trust c/o Okin Adams LLP 1113 Vine St., Ste. 201
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/11 7:46 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3357 Closed. (adol) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 12/08 2:39 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Richard Schmidt (Roman, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Wed 11/15 11:09 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Hearing Held: 1:30 PM. Appearances: Allison Weiss for Richard Schmidt Trustee. No response or objections have been filed. The court set a deadline of December 15 for the Plaintiff to file a Motion for Default. If the motion is not filed, plaintiff may file a pleading seeking alternative relief. If there is no further action by any party, the court may dismiss the case for Want of Prosecution. (mrios) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Agenda
Mon 11/13 2:42 PM
Agenda for Hearing on 11/14/2017 (Filed By Richard Schmidt ). (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate
Fri 09/22 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service for Scheduling Order (Filed By Richard Schmidt ) (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate
Fri 09/22 12:49 PM
Certificate of Service for Complaint and Summons (Filed By Richard Schmidt ) (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/14 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 09/11 4:33 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 9/11/2017 Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2017 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (adol) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 09/08 10:24 AM
Summons Issued on R&R Energy Services LLC. Date Issued 9/8/2017. (wbos) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 09/07 3:39 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on R&R Energy Services LLC. (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 08/15 10:45 AM
Summons Issued on R&R Energy Services LLC Date Issued 8/15/2017. (hcar) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 08/10 10:13 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on R&R Energy Services LLC. (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 08/09 4:45 PM
Adversary case 17-03357 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers by Richard Schmidt against R&R Energy Services LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Okin, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet for R R Energy Services LLC |