The Kind Grind Inc.
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Stephen L Johnson |
Case #: | 5:17-bk-51905 |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2017 |
Debtor
THE KIND GRIND INC
7486 Soquel Dr
Aptos, CA 95003-3820 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
John W. Richardson
2941 Park Ave. #H
Soquel, CA 95073 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113 |
Docket last updated: 08/11/2017 12:02 AM PDT |
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 08/10 2:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-51905 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 27783633, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Thu 08/10 11:45 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/08/2017 at 09:30 AM at Best Western Plus All Suites Inn. (admin, ) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 08/10 1:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335. Filed by THE KIND GRIND INC. Incomplete Filings due by 08/24/2017. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 08/24/2017. (Wargo, Karen) |