Fleetwood v. WECTEC LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10751
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10751
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-01110 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
WECTEC LLC
1000 Westinghouse Drive
Cranberry Township, PA 16066 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stone & Webster Services LLC
1000 Westinghouse Drive
Cranberry Township, PA 16066 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Fleetwood, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 10/17 9:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1110 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
||
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/27 1:42 PM
Consolidated Scheduling Order signed on 12/27/2017. Final pre-trial Conference to be held on 12/7/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW). The WARN proceedings 17-1109 17-1110 and 17-1215 shall be consolidated under adversary proceeding. 17-1109 (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Motion. Authorize
Mon 11/20 4:26 PM
Order signed on 11/20/2017 granting motion of the Statutory Unsecured Claimholders' Committee authorizing its intervention in adversary proceeding 17-1110 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
20
pgs
misc
Transcript
Tue 12/05 2:51 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 11/15/17 at 11:00 AM RE: Motion of the Statutory Unsecured Claimholders' Committee authorizing its intervention in adversary proceeding no. 17-1110 Pre-trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/14/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/27/2017. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 12/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/18/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/14/2018. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 11/10 11:28 PM
Affidavit of Service re service of: Motion of the Statutory Unsecured Claimholders' Committee for Entry of an Order Authorizing its Intervention in Adversary Proceeding No. 1:17-AP-1110 filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion, Authorize
Wed 11/01 11:42 AM
Motion to Authorize / Motion of the Statutory Unsecured Claimholders' Committee for Entry of an Order Authorizing its Intervention in Adversary Proceeding No. 1:17-AP-1110 filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Statutory Unsecured Claimholders' Committee of Westinghouse Electronic Company LLC with hearing to be held on 11/15/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Responses due by 11/8/2017,. (Karcher, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 09/12 2:34 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 9/12/2017 extending defendants' time to answer to a date to be determined at the October 26, 2017 pre-trial conference. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/25 11:07 AM
Certificate of Service re Adversary Class Action Complaint and Summons with Notice of Pretrial Conference Filed by Rene S. Roupinian on behalf of Andrew Fleetwood. (Roupinian, Rene) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thu 08/17 2:20 PM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/26/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 9/18/2017, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Tue 08/15 3:30 PM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by Rene S. Roupinian on behalf of Andrew Fleetwood. (Roupinian, Rene) |
||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 08/11 2:50 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/26/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 9/11/2017, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Thu 08/10 8:18 PM
Adversary case 17-01110 Complaint against WECTEC LLC, Stone & Webster Services LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Rene S. Roupinian on behalf of Andrew Fleetwood. (Roupinian, Rene) |