Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-17465

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:17-bk-17471
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2017
Terminated:Sep 06, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Myton Oilfield Rentals, LLC
7979 E Tufts Ave Ste 1150
Denver, CO 80237-2886
Represented By
Theodore J. Hartl
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
63 63 court Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11) Wed 09/06 10:16 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
62 62 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/31 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 61 Generic Order