Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Marcia G Cooke
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 0:17-cv-61611
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2017
Terminated:Dec 21, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2018 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
an Indiana insurance company 251 North Illinois Street Suite 1100
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Alfred Coard Warrington, V.
Clyde & Co Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Execuflight, Inc.
a Florida corporation 1621 S. Perimeter Rd Hangar 35B
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309
Represented By
Christina Veronica Paradowski
Tripp Scott, P.A.
contact info
Edward Royce Curtis
Tripp Scott
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/31 2:59 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Execuflight, Inc. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/31/2018. (tm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/24 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Execuflight, Inc. (Paradowski, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2017
19 19 order Administrative Order Thu 12/21 10:27 AM
Order Administratively Closing Case Upon Notice of Settlement. Motions terminated:10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file scheduling report filed by Execuflight, Inc.,9 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Federal Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/21/2017. (tm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2017
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 12/01 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Pending by Execuflight, Inc. (Paradowski, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2017
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/17 3:33 PM
NOTICE by Execuflight, Inc. of Selection of Mediator (Paradowski, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2017
16 16 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 10/20 9:10 AM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: ( Jury Trial set for 10/29/2018 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 10/24/2018 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2018., Expert Discovery due by 7/27/2018., Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 3/16/2018., Final proposed jury instructions and verdict form Deadline 10/19/2018., In Limine Motions due by 9/14/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2018., Daubert and Markman Motions due by 8/3/2018., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/14/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 8/10/2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/20/2017. (tm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/19 11:43 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Warrington, Alfred)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/12 3:46 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Execuflight, Inc.. Replies due by 10/19/2017. (Paradowski, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2017
13 13 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/09 3:31 PM
Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman . Filed by Execuflight, Inc. (Curtis, Edward)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 10/09 3:27 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Execuflight, Inc.(Curtis, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Dates
Thursday, October 05, 2017
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 10/05 10:33 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Execuflight, Inc.. Federal Insurance Company served on 8/18/2017, answer due 9/8/2017. (Curtis, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2017
10 10 motion Extension of Time Mon 10/02 1:38 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file scheduling report by Execuflight, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2017(Paradowski, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 28, 2017
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 09/28 11:33 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Federal Insurance Company. Attorney Alfred Coard Warrington, V added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/12/2017 (Warrington, Alfred)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 09/20 1:53 PM
ORDER EXPEDITING SERVICE, (Expedited Service Deadline 11/20/2017.) Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2017. (tm)
Related: [-]
7 7 8 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 09/20 1:52 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2017. (tm)
Related: [-]
6 6 7 pgs order Order Referring Case to Judge Wed 09/20 1:51 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/20/2017. (tm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 08/11 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (asl)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 08/11 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Execuflight, Inc. (Curtis, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
3 3 order Clerks Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Fri 08/11 1:28 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - the Summons is blank. (lrz1)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 08/11 1:26 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lrz1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against Execuflight, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9964850, filed by Execuflight, Inc..(Curtis, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Ins Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Correspondence,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Correspondence,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Correspondence