Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Timothy P Greeley
Case #: 2:17-cv-00137
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2017
Terminated:Sep 24, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2018 4:07 AM EST
defendant
91st District Court
Represented By
Gregory R. Grant
Cummings, Mcclorey, Davis & Acho, PLC
contact info
defendant
Eric G. Blubaugh
Represented By
Gregory R. Grant
Cummings, Mcclorey, Davis & Acho, PLC
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
William W. Jack, Jr.
Smith Haughey Rice & Roegge Pc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Ann Mikolowski
Represented By
Erin Lynn Dornbos
Pinsky Smith Fayette & Kennedy LLP
contact info
Sarah Riley Howard
Pinsky Smith Fayette & Kennedy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, September 24, 2018
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 09/24 8:32 AM
ORDER granting STIPULATION39 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 21, 2018
39 39 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Fri 09/21 10:27 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal by defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
38 38 1 pgs order Order Wed 08/29 10:09 AM
ORDER re37 - if dismissal not filed by 9/21, a status conference will be held 9/24/2018 at 2:30 and will require counsel to attend ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
Related: [-]
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 08/29 10:07 AM
ORDER granting STIPULATION36 - dismissal paperwork to be filed by 9/21/2018 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
36 36 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 08/28 5:17 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time to file settlement and dismissal papers by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
35 35 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 08/07 9:05 AM
MINUTES of telephone conference regarding settlement held before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Proceedings Not Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
34 34 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/25 4:44 PM
ORDER regarding Dismissal Paperwork - stip to be filed by 8/24. If stip not filed, status conference 8/30/2018 at 10:30 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
33 33 service Proof of Service Tue 07/10 3:50 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh for Response to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents with bate stamped docs (Not furnished to Court) and bate stamped documents re: Plaintiff's four Subpoenas (Not furnished to Court) (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
32 32 service Proof of Service Thu 07/05 3:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski for Amended Notice of Taking Depositions and Subpoenas to Testify (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
31 31 service Proof of Service Fri 06/29 11:39 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski for Notices of Taking Depositions, Subpoenas and Third Request for Production of Documents (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
30 30 service Proof of Service Tue 05/29 10:10 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski for 2nd Request for Production of Documents (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
29 29 service Proof of Service Wed 05/16 9:29 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski for Notice of Depositions (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
28 28 service Proof of Service Mon 05/14 1:19 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh for Notice of Taking Video Deposition - Plaintiff Ann Mikolowski (Not furnished to Court) (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
27 27 service Proof of Service Tue 05/01 9:50 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh for Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2)(A) Disclosures with attachments (Not furnished to Court) (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
26 26 service Proof of Service Fri 03/23 12:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh for Answers to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories (Not furnished to Court) and Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents with disc containing bate stamped documents #1-483 (Not furnished to Court) (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
25 25 service Proof of Service Fri 02/23 12:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski for Answers to 2nd Set of Interrogatories (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
24 24 service Proof of Service Tue 01/30 1:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski for a disc with Plaintiff's Answer to First Request for Production of Documents (Howard, Sarah) Modified text on 1/30/2018 (slk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
23 23 service Proof of Service Wed 01/24 12:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh for Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Not furnished to Court) (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
notice Change of Address - Attorney Thu 01/25 2:22 PM
CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory R. Grant for defendant 91st District Court to 310 W. Front Street, Ste. 221, as taken from Proof of Service23 (cep)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
22 22 service Proof of Service Tue 01/23 1:51 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski for Interrogatories and First Request to Produce Documents (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
21 21 service Proof of Service Tue 01/16 3:04 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski for Answers to First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
20 20 service Proof of Service Thu 12/07 1:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski for Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Proof of Service Thu 12/07 8:40 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures with attached copies of documents 1-200 (Not furnished to Court) (Grant, Gregory) Modified text on 12/7/2017 (slk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Thu 11/30 2:47 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 36991 as to plaintiff Ann Mikolowski (lep)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Thu 11/30 2:27 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 108832 as to defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh (lep)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
18 18 service Proof of Service Tue 11/28 2:49 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh for Defenants' First Set of Interrogatories & First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Not furnished to Court) (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
17 17 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Wed 11/22 3:05 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator William W. Jack, Jr ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 11/29/2017 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 11/29/2017 (lep)
Related: [-]
16 16 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Wed 11/22 11:23 AM
SELECTION of William Jack as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
15 15 order Case Management Order Mon 11/20 1:28 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: settlement conference and final pretrial conference set for 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley; jury trial set for 7/22/2019 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 By Telephone Mon 11/20 1:06 PM
MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Proceedings Not Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2017
13 13 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Fri 10/27 10:25 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
12 12 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone Thu 10/19 7:58 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 11/20/2017 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley; status report due by 11/16/2017 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
11 11 misc Jury Demand Wed 10/18 11:06 AM
DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by defendant Eric G. Blubaugh (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 10/18 10:01 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint4 with affirmative defenses and jury demand Related [+] by 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-] liance Upon Plaintiff's Jury Demand
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 10/18 9:54 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory R. Grant on behalf of defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh (Grant, Gregory)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 10/18 11:03 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Erin Lynn Dornbos on behalf of plaintiff Ann Mikolowski (Dornbos, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2017
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/15 2:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ann Mikolowski as to Eric G. Blubaugh waiver sent on 8/25/2017, answer due 10/24/2017 (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/15 2:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ann Mikolowski as to 91st District Court waiver sent on 8/25/2017, answer due 10/24/2017 (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
7 7 misc Exhibit Wed 08/23 4:38 PM
Corrected Exhibit A EXHIBIT re4 by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notify Attorney Notice Wed 08/23 4:22 PM
NOTICE to attorney Sarah Howard regarding recent filing5 (cep)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Exhibit Wed 08/23 9:46 AM
Exhibit A - CBA EXHIBIT re4 First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/22 3:32 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Ann Mikolowski (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Thu 08/24 2:04 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to plaintiff Ann Mikolowski (none provided) (cep)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/11 1:38 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants 91st District Court, Eric G. Blubaugh (cep)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Fri 08/11 1:33 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (cep)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Ann Mikolowski (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Summonses
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 08/11 10:28 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Ann Mikolowski in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3913229 (Howard, Sarah)
Related: [-]