Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:17-cv-00698
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2017
Terminated:Jan 30, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2018 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Williams & Strohm, LLC
Two Miranova Place Suite 380
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Carl Andrew Anthony
Freund Freeze & Arnold
contact info
Lindsay Marsico Johnson
Freund Freeze & Arnold
contact info
Plaintiff
Jill A Schwegler
5141 Vinington Place
Dublin, OH 43016
Represented By
Timothy J. Cook
Doucet & Associates Co, LLC
contact info
Andrew J Gerling
Doucet & Associates, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, January 19, 2018
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/19 5:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Plaintiff Jill A Schwegler. (Cook, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2017
8 8 notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/08 11:55 AM
NOTICE vacating 12/13/2017 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. A Stipulated Dismissal Notice is due on or before 2/7/2018. (agm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 12/07 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Jill A Schwegler (Cook, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
6 6 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 10/26 10:53 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Jill A Schwegler. (Cook, Timothy)
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 10/26 10:16 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand by Defendant Williams & Strohm, LLC. (Johnson, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/11 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/10 1:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Williams & Strohm, LLC. (Johnson, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/05 3:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Williams & Strohm, LLC on 8/11/2017, answer due 10/10/2017. (Cook, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 11:43 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Money Damages and Other Relief against Williams & Strohm, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6077210), filed by Jill A Schwegler. (Cook, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- January Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- June Letter