Colorado District Court
Judge:Lewis T Babcock
Case #: 1:17-cv-01944
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2017
Terminated:May 21, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2018 1:33 AM MST
Defendant
Sophia (I) Helene Nix
Defendant
(I) Shoemaker
Defendant
Tony G. Spurlock
Defendant
Tony (I) G. Spurlock
Defendant
Jessica Lee Baker Isaacs
Defendant
Jessica (I) Lee Baker Isaacs
Defendant
Stephanie Renee Canton
Defendant
Stephanie (I) Renne Canton
Defendant
Kevin (I) Duffy
Defendant
Timothy G Moser
Defendant
Timothy (I) G Moser
Defendant
Sophia Helene Nix
Defendant
Brock Benton Bowers
Defendant
Babatunde Gbolade Okuleye
Defendant
Babatunde (I) Gbolade Okuleye
Defendant
Jody Lynn Ramos
Defendant
Jody (I) Lynn Ramos
Defendant
Kari Ann Smith
Defendant
Kari (I) Ann Smith
Defendant
Rachel Grace Zeldenrust
Defendant
Rachel (I) Grace Zeldenrust
Defendant
Sara Clay
Defendant
Sara (I) Clay
Defendant
Parkinson
Defendant
Parkinson (I)
Defendant
Brock (I) Benton Bowers
Defendant
Kevan Carlson
Defendant
Kevan (I) Carlson
Defendant
Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Defendant
Douglas County Detention Facility
Defendant
Douglas County Sheriff's Office
Defendant
Kevin Duffy
Defendant
John Glassburner
Defendant
John (I) Glassburner
Defendant
Keshia Lorquet
Defendant
Keshia (I) Lorquet
Defendant
Christy Odum
Defendant
Christy (I) Odum
Defendant
Shoemaker
Plaintiff
Emily Suzanne Barry
9633 Kalamere Court
Highlands Ranch, CO 80126
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Rachel Zeldenrust
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Rachel (I) Zeldenrust
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Jody (I) Ramos
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Stephanie Canton
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Stephanie (I) Canton
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Jessica Isaacs
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Jessica (I) Isaacs
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Moser
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
(I) Moser
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Sophia Nix
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Sophia (I) Nix
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Okuleye
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
(I) Okuleye
Terminated: 09/12/2017
Defendant
Jody Ramos
Terminated: 09/12/2017


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Monday, May 21, 2018
20 20 order Judgment Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Pro Se survey deadline Mon 05/21 2:55 PM
JUDGMENT re:19 Order of Dismissal by Clerk on 5/21/2018. (angar, )
Related: [-]
19 19 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/21 2:52 PM
ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/21/2018. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
18 18 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/11 2:31 PM
ORDER Granting Motion and Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint. The Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to File Amended Complaint (ECF No.17 ) is granted. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint on the Court-approved form that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice; however it likely will operate as a dismissal with prejudice because it appears that the statute of limitations has expired on Plaintiff's claims, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/11/2018. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
17 17 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/10 12:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Additional Time to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Emily Suzanne Barry. (agarc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Mon 03/05 4:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/5/2018. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No.15 ) is denied without prejudice as premature. Plaintiff is reminded that she must file a Second Amended Complaint on the Court-approved form that complies with the Order Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 12) on or before April 4, 2018 . If Plaintiff fails to file a Second Amended Complaint that complies with the Order within the time allowed, some or all of this action may be dismissed without further notice. (agarc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
15 15 motion Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Fri 02/02 10:17 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Emily Suzanne Barry. (agarc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 01/31 2:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On January 29, 2018, Plaintiff filed a "Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint" (ECF No.13 ). The Motion is GRANTED as follows: Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint, in compliance with the December 27, 2017 Order, on or before March 2, 2018. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of some or all of this action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/31/2018. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
13 13 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/30 10:47 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Emily Suzanne Barry. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
12 12 7 pgs order Order Wed 12/27 4:33 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/27/2017. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/29 9:31 AM
AMENDED Pleading/COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Jessica (I) Lee Baker Isaacs, Jessica Lee Baker Isaacs, Brock Benton Bowers, Brock (I) Benton Bowers, Stephanie (I) Renne Canton, Stephanie Renee Canton, Kevan Carlson, Kevan (I) Carlson, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Douglas County Detention Facility, Douglas County Sheriff's Office, Kevin Duffy, Kevin (I) Duffy, John Glassburner, John (I) Glassburner, Keshia Lorquet, Keshia (I) Lorquet, Timothy (I) G Moser, Timothy G Moser, Sophia Helene Nix, Sophia (I) Helene Nix, Christy Odum, Christy (I) Odum, Babatunde Gbolade Okuleye, Babatunde (I) Gbolade Okuleye, Jody Lynn Ramos, Jody (I) Lynn Ramos, Shoemaker, (I) Shoemaker, Kari Ann Smith, Kari (I) Ann Smith, Tony G. Spurlock, Tony (I) G. Spurlock, Rachel (I) Grace Zeldenrust, Rachel Grace Zeldenrust, Sara Clay, Sara (I) Clay, Parkinson, Parkinson (I), filed by Emily Suzanne Barry.(angar, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2017
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/29 9:10 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Jessica (I) Lee Baker Isaacs, Jessica Lee Baker Isaacs, Brock Benton Bowers, Brock (I) Benton Bowers, Stephanie (I) Renne Canton, Stephanie Renee Canton, Kevan Carlson, Kevan (I) Carlson, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Douglas County Detention Facility, Douglas County Sheriff's Office, Kevin Duffy, Kevin (I) Duffy, John Glassburner, John (I) Glassburner, Keshia Lorquet, Keshia (I) Lorquet, Timothy (I) G Moser, Timothy G Moser, Sophia Helene Nix, Sophia (I) Helene Nix, Christy Odum, Christy (I) Odum, Babatunde Gbolade Okuleye, Babatunde (I) Gbolade Okuleye, Jody Lynn Ramos, Jody (I) Lynn Ramos, Shoemaker, (I) Shoemaker, Kari Ann Smith, Kari (I) Ann Smith, Tony G. Spurlock, Tony (I) G. Spurlock, Rachel (I) Grace Zeldenrust, Rachel Grace Zeldenrust, filed by Emily Suzanne Barry.(angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2017
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 10/30 3:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On October 25, 2017, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint (ECF No.8 ). The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff will have thirty days from the date of this Minute Order to file an amended complaint, as directed in the Court's September 25, 2017 order to amend. Plaintiff is reminded that if she fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/30/2017. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
8 8 motion Extension of Time Fri 10/27 12:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Emily Suzanne Barry. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2017
7 7 8 pgs order Order Mon 09/25 4:17 PM
ORDER to Amend. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, some or all of the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 09/25/2017. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/20 3:49 PM
ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. The Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No.3 ) is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/20/2017. (agarc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/15 10:55 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brock Benton Bowers, Brock (I) Benton Bowers, Kevan Carlson, Kevan (I) Carlson, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Douglas County Detention Facility, Douglas County Sheriff's Office, Kevan (I) Duffy, Kevin Duffy, John Glassburner, John (I) Glassburner, Keshia Lorquet, Keshia (I) Lorquet, Christy Odum, Christy (I) Odum, Shoemaker, (I) Shoemaker, Tony G. Spurlock, Tony (I) G. Spurlock, Jessica (i) Lee Baker, Jessica Lee Baker, Rachel (i) Lee Zelderust, Rachel Grace Zeldenrust, Stephanie (i) Renee Canton, Stephanie Renee Canton, Timothy (i) G Moser, Timothy G Moser, Babatunde (i) Gbolade Okuleye, Babatunde Gbolade Okuleye, Jody (i) Lynn Ramos, Jody Lynn Ramos, Sophia (i) Helene Nix, Sophia Helene Nix, filed by Emily Barry.(angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
4 4 order Order Mon 08/14 2:27 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order , the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 08/14/2017. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/11 4:02 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Emily Barry. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 08/11 4:01 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Brock Benton Bowers, Brock (I) Benton Bowers, Stephanie Canton, Stephanie (I) Canton, Kevan Carlson, Kevan (I) Carlson, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Douglas County Detention Facility, Douglas County Sheriff's Office, Kevan (I) Duffy, Kevin Duffy, John Glassburner, John (I) Glassburner, Jessica Isaacs, Jessica (I) Isaacs, Keshia Lorquet, Keshia (I) Lorquet, Moser, (I) Moser, Sophia Nix, Sophia (I) Nix, Christy Odum, Christy (I) Odum, Okuleye, (I) Okuleye, Jody Ramos, Jody (I) Ramos, Shoemaker, (I) Shoemaker, Kari Smith, Kari (I) Smith, Tony G. Spurlock, Tony (I) G. Spurlock, Rachel Zeldenrust, Rachel (I) Zeldenrust, filed by Emily Barry.(rvill, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet