Massachusetts District Court
Judge:William G Young
Case #: 1:17-cv-11504
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2017
Terminated:Jan 23, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2018 5:03 AM EST
Consolidated Defendant
Northland Securities, Inc.
Represented By
Erin R. Macgowan
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
David B. Hennes
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ny
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Summit Investors I, LLC
Represented By
Ezekiel Hill
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Lavinia Weizel
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, PC
contact info
Carl E. Metzger
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
John F. Sylvia
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Adam L. Sisitsky
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Joseph P. Rockers
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
John Lomedico
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Matrix Partners VIII, L.P.
Represented By
Lavinia Weizel
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, PC
contact info
John F. Sylvia
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Adam L. Sisitsky
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.
Represented By
Erin R. Macgowan
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
David B. Hennes
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ny
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Benny P. Mikkelsen
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By
Erin R. Macgowan
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
David B. Hennes
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ny
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Francis J. Murphy
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Needham & Company, LLC
Represented By
Erin R. Macgowan
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
David B. Hennes
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ny
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Summit Partners Venture Capital Fund III-B, L.P.
Represented By
Ezekiel Hill
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Lavinia Weizel
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, PC
contact info
Carl E. Metzger
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
John F. Sylvia
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Adam L. Sisitsky
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Joseph P. Rockers
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
OFS Fitel, LLC
Represented By
Terence P. McCourt
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Gustavo Ribeiro
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
David Gouzoules
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Lisa R. Bugni
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Christian Rasmussen
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Stan J. Reiss
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
John Ritchie
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Vincent T. Roche
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Summit Investors I (UK), L.P.
Represented By
Ezekiel Hill
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Lavinia Weizel
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, PC
contact info
Carl E. Metzger
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
John F. Sylvia
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Adam L. Sisitsky
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Joseph P. Rockers
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Bhupendra C. Shah
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By
Erin R. Macgowan
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
David B. Hennes
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ny
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Givehchi LLC
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Mehrdad Givehchi
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Egan Managed Capital III, L.P.
Represented By
Lavinia Weizel
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, PC
contact info
John F. Sylvia
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Adam L. Sisitsky
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By
Erin R. Macgowan
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
David B. Hennes
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ny
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Summit Partners Venture Captial Fund III-A, L.P.
Represented By
Ezekiel Hill
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Lavinia Weizel
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, PC
contact info
Carl E. Metzger
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
John F. Sylvia
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Adam L. Sisitsky
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Joseph P. Rockers
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By
Erin R. Macgowan
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
David B. Hennes
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ny
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Commonwealth Capital Ventures IV L.P.
Represented By
Lavinia Weizel
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, PC
contact info
John F. Sylvia
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Adam L. Sisitsky
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Eric A. Swanson
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Peter Y. Chung
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Bhupendra Shah 1999 Trust U/A DTD 10/06/1999
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
The Malini Shanmugaraj 2016 QTIP Trust
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Weston & Co. VIII, LLC
Represented By
Lavinia Weizel
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, PC
contact info
John F. Sylvia
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Adam L. Sisitsky
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
William Blair & Company L.C.C.
Represented By
Erin R. Macgowan
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
John D. Donovan, Jr.
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ma
contact info
David B. Hennes
Ropes & Gray Llp - Ny
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Hui Zhang
Represented By
Joshua L. Crowell
contact info
Jeffrey C Block
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info
Jason M. Leviton
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Jonathan Wong
Represented By
Matthew H. Lee
The Brown Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Rina Rollhaus
Represented By
Edward F. Haber
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Jason M. Leviton
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info
Adam M. Stewart
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Chris Kebler
Represented By
Michael Ira Fistel, Jr.
Johnson Fistel, LLP
contact info
Alan L. Kovacs
Law Office Of Alan L. Kovacs
contact info
Jason M. Leviton
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info
David A. Rosenfeld
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Glade Dennis
Represented By
Peter C. Horstmann
Law Offices Of Peter Charles Horstmann
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Karen Colgan
Represented By
Steven R. Wedeking
Robbins Arroyo LLP
contact info
Peter C. Horstmann
Law Offices Of Peter Charles Horstmann
contact info
Felipe J. Arroyo
Robbins Arroyo LLP
contact info
Defendant
Murugesan Shanmugaraj
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Defendant
John F. Gavin
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Defendant
Acacia Communications, Inc.
Represented By
Peter J. Kolovos
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Daniel W. Halston
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Erika M. Schutzman
Wilmer Hale LLP
contact info
Ian D. Coghill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Harriet Hoder
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Movant
Subhash Saha
Represented By
Joshua Baker
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Movant
Rina Rollhaus
Represented By
Jack G. Fruchter
Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP
contact info
Adam M. Stewart
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Lawrence D. Levit
Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP
contact info
Movant
David A. Klopfenstein
Represented By
Theodore M. Hess-Mahan
Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross And Mandelcorn, LLP
contact info
Movant
WKW Partners Fund I, LP
Represented By
Jason M. Leviton
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Sobala
Represented By
Mitchell J. Matorin
Matorin Law Office LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Tharp
Represented By
Vincent M. Serra
Robbins Gellerrudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Theodore M. Hess-Mahan
Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross And Mandelcorn, LLP
contact info
Jeremy A. Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Joseph F. Russello
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Jason M. Leviton
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 15 2018
Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER"For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES the Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Complaint as futile. ECF No. 160. The Court GRANTS the Acacia Defendants, the Selling Defendants, and the Underwriter Defendants motions to dismiss the complaint. ECF Nos. 98, 101, 105. The Court DENIES OFSs motion to dismiss the complaint as moot because the Plaintiffs no longer allege any indiscretions by it in their Proposed Amended Complaint. ECF No. 103.SO ORDERED."(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)

Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Monday, February 04, 2019
204 204 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 02/04 10:56 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ian D. Coghill, Daniel Halston, and Peter J. Kolovos terminated (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]