Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC v. Fullerton et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David E Jones |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01119 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2018 3:03 AM CST |
Defendant
Troy R Fullerton
1909 Mallard Pointe Circle Unit D
Waukesha, WI 53189 |
|
Defendant
KB Roofing & Remodeling LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Judgment
Wed 08/22 1:18 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk approved by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 8/22/18 that KBDB's claims against Troy Fullerton are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and without costs to either Party, except the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal and the settlement agreement between the Parties. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Deft Fullerton)(kah) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 08/21 2:51 PM
STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 8/21/18. The33 Motion for Permanent Injunction and33 Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Mr. Fullerton) (kah) Modified on 8/21/2018 (kah) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Permanent Injunction Dismiss
Mon 07/16 11:17 AM
Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Stipulated) , MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated) by All Plaintiffs. (Murdock, Anthony) |
|
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Tue 07/17 7:49 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re33 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Stipulated) MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated) filed by Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC. The proposed order should have been filed as an attachment. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb) |
||
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Mediation Hearing ~Util - Case No Longer Referred
Wed 07/11 4:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Callahan, Jr: Mediation Hearing schedule for 7/12/2018 is Cancelled. The parties telephoned the Court today that were successful in reaching a resolution of this case. Consequently, this case will be reassigned back to Magistrate David E. Jones for entry of an appropriate order of dismissal once all settlement documents are prepared and executed by the parties. (dmm) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 06/08 10:10 AM
AMENDED ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS: Mediation Hearing is RESET to 7/12/18 from 9:00 AM to 12:00 PM in Chambers Room 714, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge William E Callahan Jr. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Callahan, Jr on 6/8/18. (cc: all counsel and copy mailed to Troy Fullerton)(kwb) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 04/20 2:00 PM
ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS: Mediation Hearing is set for 6/13/2018 from 9:00 AM to 12:00 PM in Chambers Room 618, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge William E Callahan Jr. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Callahan, Jr on 4/20/18. (cc: all counsel copy mailed to Troy Fullerton )(dmm) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 04/18 10:40 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 04/18/2018. IT IS ORDERED that Mr. Fullerton's Motion for Reconsideration of Order for Injunctive Relief, ECF No.24 , is DENIED. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the Order for Injunctive Relief entered March 13, 2018, ECF No.22 , will cease to be in effect on September 1, 2018. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to defendant) (amb) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (for mediation)
Tue 04/17 3:59 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William E Callahan, Jr for mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 04/17/2018. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to defendant)(amb) |
|
27 | 27
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 04/17 3:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/17/2018. Court DENIES24 Motion for Reconsideration. Court will randomly refer case to Magistrate Judge for mediation. Minutes sent to defendant via US Mail. (Tape #10:32:18 - 11:00:51) (amb) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/11 10:54 AM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC re24 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order for Injunctive Relief .(Murdock, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert J. Schulz, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael Schulz | ||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Wed 03/21 10:43 AM
BRIEF in Support filed by Troy R Fullerton, KB Roofing & Remodeling LLC re24 MOTION for Reconsideration.(amb) |
|
Att: 1 Bookmarked Exhibits | ||
24 | 24
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 03/21 10:42 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration of22 Order for Injunctive Relief by Troy R Fullerton, KB Roofing & Remodeling LLC. (amb) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
discov
Initial Disclosures
Thu 03/15 11:59 AM
RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Troy R Fullerton, KB Roofing & Remodeling LLC.(amb) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 03/13 1:31 PM
ORDER FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 03/13/2018. See order for details. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to defendants)(amb) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Wed 03/07 3:45 PM
Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/7/2018. Court GRANTS14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff is directed to submit proposed order regarding preliminary injunction to the Court. Court directs defendant to submit Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures no later than 03/14/2018. Status Conference set for 4/17/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. Minute entry sent to defendant via US Mail. (Tape #9:59:44 - 10:13:25.) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 03/07 10:31 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on March 7, 2018. Due to the defendants' failure to respond, the Court GRANTS Knutson Bros. Design-Build, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim for Lack of Jurisdiction. ECF No.14 . NOTE: There is no document attached to this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (KLM) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Wed 01/17 6:17 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC re18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Troy Fullerton and KB Roofing & Remodeling, LLC .(Murdock, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Robert Schulz | ||
18 | 18
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 01/17 6:14 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Troy Fullerton and KB Roofing & Remodeling, LLC by Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC. (Murdock, Andrea) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 01/03 3:13 PM
TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 01/03/2018. Pursuant to the Minute Entry (ECF no.16 ) and the plaintiff's email, the Court orders the following: Deadline to join other parties due by 1/10/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2018, Defendants to respond to pending motion to dismiss (ECF no.14 ) by 1/17/2018, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/17/2018, Rule 26(e)(1) disclosures due by 4/5/2018, Discovery due by 4/30/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2018. The parties shall preserve all emails, voice mail messages, text messages, websites, and social media sites relevant to the claims and defenses asserted in this action. ESI shall be produced in image format with searchable text attributes. If a party reasonably believes that any discovery to be produced contains confidential information, the party shall mark the discovery as confidential, and any discovery marked as confidential shall not be disclosed to any non-party other than attorneys and experts for the parties. Status Conference set for 3/7/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties will discuss referring case for mediation and if setting a trial date will be necessary. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. There is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to defendants)(amb) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 12/28 9:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/27/2017. Defendant not present for hearing. The Court directs the plaintiff to email courtroom deputy proposed schedule. Copy of minutes sent to defendant via US Mail. (Tape #10:01:28 - 10:13:08) (amb) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Tue 12/26 6:02 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Murdock, Andrea) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 12/26 5:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC.(Murdock, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim | ||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/15 4:01 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Defendants. (amb) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/15 3:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Troy R Fullerton.(amb) |
|
utility
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Fri 12/15 4:01 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (amb) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 12/11 12:29 PM
Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/8/2017. Parties discuss case and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by defendant. The Court GRANTS in part defendant's9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court orders the defendant to file an answer by Friday, 12/15/2017. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. Parties are ordered to discuss setting dates for case. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call. (Tape #10:02:52 - 10:21:03.) (amb) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Tue 12/05 9:50 AM
LETTER from the clerk to defendant Troy R. Fullerton re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 12/05 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/8/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call.(cc: all counsel, via US Mail to defendant Troy Fullerton)(amb) |
||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 12/04 3:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond by Troy R Fullerton. (amb) |
|
Saturday, November 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service by Publication
Sat 11/11 9:20 PM
SERVICE by Publication filed by Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC. Last publication date 10/27/2017. (Murdock, Andrea) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Sat 11/11 9:17 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC as to KB Roofing & Remodeling LLC. (Murdock, Andrea) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Sat 11/11 9:14 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Knutson Bros Design-Build LLC as to Troy R Fullerton. (Murdock, Andrea) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Fri 09/29 6:22 PM
LETTER from Attorney Andrea L. Murdock re report of status of service on each defendant . (Murdock, Andrea) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 08/15 10:09 AM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs. (Murdock, Anthony) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/15 10:02 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Murdock, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
order
Text Only Order
Tue 08/15 8:15 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 08/15/2017. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(amb) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/15 8:17 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (amb) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/14 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Knutson Bros. Design-Build LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2643223)(Murdock, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Troy Fullerton, | ||
Att: 2 Summons KB Roofing & Remodeling LLC, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 08/14 12:36 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) |