Harmony Gold, USA, Inc. v. Tatsunoko Production Co., Ltd.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06034 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 09:0009 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2018 1:01 AM PST |
Petitioner
Harmony Gold, USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Tatsunoko Production Co., Ltd.
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
26
pgs
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 08/29 12:54 PM
AMENDED JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD by Judge Percy Anderson, Related to: Judgment,15 . (See document for specifics) (mrgo) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
judgmentCV
Judgment
Thu 08/24 12:00 PM
JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD by Judge Percy Anderson, Related to: Stipulation for Judgment,14 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED: That the Arbitration Award issued by the Independent Film & Television Alliance on June 28, 2017 in connection with the arbitration proceedings between Petitioner and Tatsunoko Production Co., Ltd., a true and correct copy of which is attached hereto as Exhibit A, is the Judgment of this Court. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo) |
|
14 | 14
3
pgs
stip
Judgment
Wed 08/23 9:52 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Confirming Arbitration Award filed by Petitioner Harmony Gold, USA, Inc..(Stebbins Bina, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1 - Proposed Judgement to Confirm Aribtration Award, | ||
Att: 2 24 pgs Exhibit A - Arbitration Award, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Confirming Arbitration Award | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 08/21 8:23 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Petitioner Harmony Gold, USA, Inc.. upon Tatsunoko Production Co., Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/17/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Bruce Glbert, Esq. Counsel for Tatsunoko Production Co., Ltd.. (Stebbins Bina, Jessica) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Tue 08/22 9:06 AM
ORDER DENYING UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN PORTIONS OF ARBITRATION AWARD6 by Judge Percy Anderson: [T]he Court concludes that Petitioner has failed to make the required showing to justify sealing portions of the Arbitration Award, and its Application is therefore denied without prejudice. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
10
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/16 10:53 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 08/15 1:26 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Tatsunoko Production Co., Ltd. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 08/15 1:23 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 08/15 1:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
attyseal
Sealed Declaration in Support
Mon 08/14 5:14 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Certain Portions of Arbitration Award under seal6 filed by Petitioner Harmony Gold, USA, Inc..(Stebbins Bina, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Unredacted Document Ex. 1 - Petiton to Confirm Award | ||
6 | 6
4
pgs
motion
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Mon 08/14 5:04 PM
APPLICATION to file document Certain Portions of Arbitration Award under seal filed by Petitioner Harmony Gold, USA, Inc..(Stebbins Bina, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 22 pgs Redacted Document Ex. 1 - Arbitration Award | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
notice
Summons Request
Mon 08/14 4:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Petitioner Harmony Gold, USA, Inc.. (Stebbins Bina, Jessica) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/14 4:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petitioner Harmony Gold, USA, Inc. identifying No Corporate Parent as Corporate Parent. (Stebbins Bina, Jessica) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 08/14 4:32 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Harmony Gold, USA, Inc., identifying No other interested parties other than Petitioner and Respondent. (Stebbins Bina, Jessica) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 08/14 4:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Harmony Gold, USA, Inc.. (Stebbins Bina, Jessica) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 08/14 4:11 PM
PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment Receipt No: 0973-20347784 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Harmony Gold, USA, Inc.. (Attorney Jessica Stebbins Bina added to party Harmony Gold, USA, Inc.(pty:pet))(Stebbins Bina, Jessica) |