Safer Chem, Healthy Families, et al v. USEPA, et al
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-ag-72260 |
Type | agency / review |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 12, 2018 11:13 AM PDT |
Intervenor
AMERICAN COKE AND COAL CHEMICALS INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
AMERICAN COATINGS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
UTILITY SOLID WASTE ACTIVITIES GROUP
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
STYRENE INFORMATION AND RESEARCH CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
SOCIETY OF CHEMICAL MANUFACTURERS AND AFFILIATES
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
SILVER NANOTECHNOLOGY WORKING GROUP
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
POLYURETHANE MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
NATIONAL MINING ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHEMICAL DISTRIBUTORS
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
IPC INTERNATIONAL, INC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
AMERICAN FOREST & PAPER ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
AMERICAN FUEL & PETROCHEMICAL MANUFACTURERS
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
ASSOCIATION CONNECTING ELECTRONICS INDUSTRIES
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
BATTERY COUNCIL INTERNATIONAL
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
EPS INDUSTRY ALLIANCE
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Pending
AMERICAN FUEL & PETROCHEMICAL MANUFACTURERS
|
|
Intervenor - Pending
STYRENE INFORMATION AND RESOURCE CENTER
|
|
Petitioner
ALASKA COMMUNITY ACTION ON TOXICS
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
VERMONT PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
ASBESTOS DISEASE AWARENESS ORGANIZATION
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WE ACT FOR ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO, CLC
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
UNION OF CONCERNED SCIENTISTS
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
SIERRA CLUB
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
LEARNING DISABILITIES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
ENVIRONMENTAL WORKING GROUP
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH STRATEGY CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
SAFER CHEMICALS HEALTHY FAMILIES
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
SCOTT PRUITT, Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal court rules Trump EPA unlawfully excluded dangerous chemicals from review (thehill.com) |
Submitted Fri 11/15/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 07/08/2021 1:26 PM PDT |