Sloan v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02754 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2018 2:08 AM MST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Sloan
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Taipei American School
Terminated: 09/13/2017
|
|
Defendant
Taipei American School Foundation
Terminated: 09/13/2017
|
|
Defendant
Taipei American School Foundation Disability Plan
Terminated: 09/13/2017
|
|
Defendant
Trustee of the Group Insurance Trust for Employers in the Services Industry
Terminated: 09/13/2017
|
|
Defendant
Trustee of the Group Insurance Trust for Employers in the Services Industry Disability Plan
Terminated: 09/13/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 01/22 4:56 PM
ORDER granting the23 Stipulated Motion and dismissing this action in its entirety, with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/22/2018. (LFIG) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/18 11:03 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Patricia Sloan.(Davis, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Tue 11/28 5:22 PM
ORDER that a Stipulation to Dismiss shall be filed on or before January 29, 2018. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed, the parties shall file a Status Report to the Court on that date. ORDERED that the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for December 1, 2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/28/2017. (LFIG) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 11/28 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Patricia Sloan. (Davis, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 11/22 11:59 AM
ORDER: Upon review by the Court, IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend JCMR and Initial Discovery Responses Deadlines (Doc.19 ) is GRANTED. The deadline for filing the Joint Case Management Report is extended to Wednesday, November 29, 2017, and the deadline for submitting mandatory initial discovery responses is extended to Thursday, November 30, 2017. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/22/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Tue 11/21 11:32 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines by Patricia Sloan.(Davis, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
MIDP - Order Ext MID Response Deadline for 30 Days (Settlement)
Mon 10/23 4:59 PM
ORDER - The parties have certified that they have a good faith belief that this case will be resolved within 30 days. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation (Doc. 17) is GRANTED and the time to submit MID responses is extended for 30 days. No further extensions will be granted. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/23/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Thu 10/19 11:42 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Initial Discovery Responses Deadline by Patricia Sloan.(Davis, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)
Wed 10/18 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Kristina Novotny Holmstrom. (Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Notice of Errata
Thu 09/28 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Errata re:13 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America..(Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Answer | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 09/28 2:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent CIGNA Holdings Incorporated for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/28 2:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Holmstrom, Kristina) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/26 2:22 PM
NOTICE re: The Court's 9/22/17 Order Served by Patricia Sloan . (Davis, Scott) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 09/22 12:59 PM
ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 12/1/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendant and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/22/2017. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)
Wed 09/13 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Patricia Sloan. Party Taipei American School Foundation Disability Plan, Trustee of the Group Insurance Trust for Employers in the Services Industry, Trustee of the Group Insurance Trust for Employers in the Services Industry Disability Plan, Taipei American School and Taipei American School Foundation terminated. (Davis, Scott) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Mon 09/11 10:49 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Sloan: Return of Service re: Complaint, Exhibit, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, August 5, 2017 Minute Entry, Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, August 16, 2017 Order upon Life Insurance Company of North America on 09/07/2017. (Davis, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service Executed
Wed 09/06 4:36 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Sloan: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/21/2017 to Taipei American School . (Davis, Scott) |
|
7 | 7
service
Service Executed
Wed 09/06 4:35 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Sloan: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/21/2017 to Taipei American School Foundation . (Davis, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Wed 08/16 3:47 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/16/2017. (LFIG) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Tue 08/15 4:56 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ATD) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/15 4:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America, Taipei American School, Taipei American School Foundation, Taipei American School Foundation Disability Plan, Trustee of the Group Insurance Trust for Employers in the Services Industry, Trustee of the Group Insurance Trust for Employers in the Services Industry Disability Plan. (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 08/15 4:47 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14546736. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-02754 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ATD) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Tue 08/15 4:45 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Patricia Sloan. (submitted by Scott Davis) (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/15 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14546736 filed by Patricia Sloan. (submitted by Scott Davis) (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |