Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandr
Case #: 2:17-cv-03683
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2017
Terminated:Apr 27, 2018
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2018 3:17 AM EST
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER SPECK
Represented By
CATHERINE N. HARRINGTON
Harrington & Associates PC
contact info
CHRISTINE A. EGAN
Harrington & Associates PC
contact info
Defendant
RACHEL SPECK
Represented By
CATHERINE N. HARRINGTON
Harrington & Associates PC
contact info
CHRISTINE A. EGAN
Harrington & Associates PC
contact info
Plaintiff
ISAAC APOH
Represented By
RAYMOND M. BILY
Reiff And Bily
contact info
Plaintiff
CELESTE BROWN-APOH
Represented By
RAYMOND M. BILY
Reiff And Bily
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Terminated: 09/07/2017
Represented By
DANIEL T. LEWBART
Gerolamo Mcnulty Divis & Lewbart
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, June 08, 2018
25 25 misc Remark Mon 06/11 11:48 AM
RECEIPT OF STATE COURT RECORD SIGNED AND RETURNED TO CLERK'S OFFICE FROM PROTHONOTARY OFFICE OF JUDICIAL RECORDS ON 6/6/18. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
misc Remark Fri 06/01 2:59 PM
Original Record (Paper #11) forwarded to the Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County, PA, on 6/1/18. (kw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
misc Remark Thu 05/17 9:49 AM
Certified Copy of Order, dated 4/27/2018, mailed to the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County on 5/17/2018. (md)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/30 11:08 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION to Remand filed by CHRISTOPHER SPECK, RACHEL SPECK. (HARRINGTON, CATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Mon 04/30 12:11 PM
ORDER THAT PLFFS' MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED, & THIS MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 4/27/18.4/30/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
22 22 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 04/24 4:23 PM
RESPONSE in Support re20 MOTION to Remand Pltfs Reply to Defts Memo of Law filed in Response to Pltfs Motion to Remand filed by ISAAC APOH, CELESTE BROWN-APOH. (BILY, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/17 11:19 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Remand filed by CHRISTOPHER SPECK, RACHEL SPECK.(HARRINGTON, CATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Response to Motion,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service for Response to Motion
Thursday, April 05, 2018
20 20 motion Remand Thu 04/05 4:14 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by ISAAC APOH, CELESTE BROWN-APOH.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(BILY, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
19 19 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 12/07 4:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/7/2017 (kp, )
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/07 4:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE 3/14/2018. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/16/2018. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 6/13/2018. FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/7/2017. 12/7/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
17 17 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 12/05 3:47 PM
Proposed Case Management Plan Under Rule 26(f) by CHRISTOPHER SPECK, RACHEL SPECK. (HARRINGTON, CATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
16 16 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Mon 11/27 4:44 PM
Proposed Case Management Plan of Plaintiffs by ISAAC APOH, CELESTE BROWN-APOH. (BILY, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2017
15 15 discov Disclosure Fri 10/20 2:17 PM
Disclosure with 10/20/2017 by All Defendants.(HARRINGTON, CATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
14 14 discov Disclosure Thu 10/12 3:42 PM
Disclosure with 10 12-2017 by ISAAC APOH, CELESTE BROWN-APOH.(BILY, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2017
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/06 3:47 PM
ORDER THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/7/2017, AT 2:30 PM IN THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, ROOM 8613, PHILADELPHIA, PA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/6/17. 10/6/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2017
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 10/05 6:00 PM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint by CHRISTOPHER SPECK, RACHEL SPECK.(HARRINGTON, CATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2017
11 11 misc State Court Record Tue 10/03 10:13 AM
Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (kp, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2017
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 09/11 8:51 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S3 Motion to Dismiss IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/8/2017.9/11/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2017
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/08 12:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE against CHRISTOPHER SPECK, RACHEL SPECK filed by CELESTE BROWN-APOH, ISAAC APOH.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Response to Motion Thu 09/07 5:53 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ISAAC APOH, CELESTE BROWN-APOH. (BILY, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/06 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. HARRINGTON on behalf of CHRISTOPHER SPECK, RACHEL SPECK (HARRINGTON, CATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/29 11:39 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Allen Mularz re: served Complaint upon Christopher Speck by Personal on 8/18/17 (BILY, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/29 11:37 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Allen Mularz re: served Complaint upon Rachel Speck by Personal on 8/18/17 (BILY, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2017
4 4 notice Certificate of Counsel Thu 08/24 5:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel by RAYMOND M. BILY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BILY, RAYMOND)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 08/24 9:18 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service.(LEWBART, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2017
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY) Wed 08/16 4:20 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(tj, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/16 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY from Philadelphia CCP, case number 170701051. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 164259)(tj, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheets
adr Case Eligible for Arbitration Wed 08/16 4:20 PM
Case Eligible for Arbitration(tj, )
Related: [-]