Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Indira Talwani
Case #: 1:17-cv-11543
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2017
Terminated:Mar 22, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 13, 2018 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
Molly B Miller
273 Chauncy St.
Mansfield, MA 02048
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Jane Doe
Defendant
Jared T Zicher
39 Mirimichi St.
Plainville, MA 02762
Defendant
Walters Law Offices, P.C.
7 Cabot Place Top Floor
Stoughton, MA 02072
Defendant
Kevin B. Walters
7 Cabot Place Top Floor
Stoughton, MA 02072
Defendant
Elizabeth A Teves-Michael
22 Karen Ave
Tiverton, RI 02878
Defendant
Julius L Sokol
1 Curtis St.
East Boston, MA 02128
Defendant
Smith & Brink, P.C.
350 Granite St.
Braintree, MA 02170
Defendant
Sheff Law Offices, P.C.
d/b/a Sheff Law 10 Tremont St. 7th Floor
Boston, MA 02108
Defendant
Douglas K Sheff
10 Tremont St. 7th Floor
Boston, MA 02108
Defendant
David F Scimone
5 Commonwealth Rd.
Natick, MA 01760
Defendant
Resilient Investments, LLC
733 Turnpike St. Ste 304
No Andover, MA 01845
Defendant
Michael Philbin
29 Farragut Rd.
So. Boston, MA 02127
Defendant
Patriot Mortgage Company, Inc.
4 Lowell Rd. #11
No. Reading, MA 01864
Defendant
Brian A. Joyce Attorney-At-Law, P.C.
776R Washington St.
Canton, MA 02021
Defendant
Harmon Law Offices, P.C.
150 California St.
Newton, MA 02458
Defendant
Dragan M Cetkovic
8 Fieldstone Lane
Milton, MA 02186
Defendant
Mark V Cirignano
733 Turnpike St. Ste 304
No. Andover, MA 01845
Defendant
Shavar K Douglas
43 Juliette St.
Boston, MA 02122
Defendant
Dragan M. Cetkovic, P.C.
d/b/a Dragan & Associates 500 Granite Ave
Milton, MA 02186
Defendant
David S Flashenburg
2 Thoreau Dr.
So. Easton, MA 02375
Defendant
Michael J Garrity
29 Farragut Rd.
So. Boston, MA 02127
Defendant
Mazonson Law Office, P.C.
39 Ponkapoag Way
Canton, MA 02021
Defendant
Hornung & Scimone, P.C.
5 Commonwealth Rd.
Natick, MA 01760
Defendant
Brian A. Joyce
776R Washington St.
Canton, MA 02021
Defendant
Joyce Law Group, LLC
776R Washington St.
Canton, MA 02021
Defendant
Legal Edge Real Estate, Inc.
905 Turnpike St. Ste A1
Canton, MA 02021
Defendant
METLIFE GROUP, INC
Defendant
Adam D Mazonson
39 Ponkapoag Way
Canton, MA 02021
Defendant
Larry S. Mazonson
13769 Eastpointe Way
West Palm Beach, FL 33418
Plaintiff
Evan P Lowney
234 Tripp St. #2E
Fall River, MA 02724
Represented By
Evan P. Lowney
Evan P. Lowney, Esq.
contact info

GPO Jan 03 2018
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS (Docket Nos. 2, 3, 9) entered denying without prejudice 2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice 3 Motion to file impounded supplemental case opening material; denying as premature 9 Motion for enlargement of time to make service. If Lowney wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a fully completed Long Form Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO Form 239). (Attachments: # (1) form IFP (long form)) (PSSA, 4)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
28 28 misc Copy Mailed Wed 04/25 9:14 AM
Copy re:27 Order, mailed to Evan P. Lowney on 4/25/2018. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/25 9:13 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ALLOWING25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Plaintiff may file a Notice of Appeal no later than May 23, 2018. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 23, 2018
26 26 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 04/23 3:31 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re:25 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 23, 2018 to File Notice of Appeal with Request for Ex Parte Determination filed by Evan P Lowney. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
25 25 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/23 3:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to May 23, 2018 to File Notice of Appeal with Request for Ex Parte Determination by Evan P Lowney.(DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
24 24 misc Copy Mailed Thu 03/22 10:47 AM
Copy re23 Order, mailed to Evan P. Lowney on 3/22/2018. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 03/22 10:45 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered DENYING 21 Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint with Request for Ex Parte Determination. The case is dismissed without prejudice. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2018
20 20 misc Docket sheet sent Fri 02/09 9:44 AM
DOCKET SHEET sent to Evan P Lowney (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/09 9:42 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING18 RENEWED Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See16 Memorandum and Order. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
18 18 7 pgs motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/09 9:41 AM
RENEWED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Evan P Lowney. Leave to file granted by 16 Memorandum and Order. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
17 17 utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/09 8:36 AM
Set Deadline: Plaintiff's amended complaint due by 3/16/2018. (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
16 16 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 02/09 8:34 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting13 Motion to file renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis; striking all but paragraph 27 of Plaintiffs Memorandum14 of law; granting [13-2] Plaintiff's renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this action, he must, within thirty-five (35) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, file an amended complaint. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal. No summons shall issue pending further order of the court. (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
15 15 1 pgs notice Notice - Other Tue 01/30 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Administrative Suspension by Evan P Lowney (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
14 14 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 01/30 2:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re:13 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental IFP Application Late and REQUEST for Ex-Parte Determination filed by Evan P Lowney. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Tue 01/30 2:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental IFP Application Late and REQUEST for Ex-Parte Determination by Evan P Lowney.(DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 IFP Application
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
12 12 utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/03 11:23 AM
Set Deadline: If Lowney wishes to proceed with this action, he must either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a fully completed Long Form IFP Application due by 1/24/2018. (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
11 11 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Seal Document Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/03 11:21 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS (Docket Nos. 2, 3, 9) entered denying without prejudice2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice3 Motion to file impounded supplemental case opening material; denying as premature9 Motion for enlargement of time to make service. If Lowney wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a fully completed Long Form Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO Form 239). (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 form IFP (long form)
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
10 10 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Wed 11/29 12:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re:9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Service with Request for Ex-Parte Determination filed by Evan P Lowney. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/29 12:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Service with Request for Ex-Parte Determination by Evan P Lowney.(DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 08/29 1:01 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (adminn, )
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 08/29 10:45 AM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: According to Local Rule 40.1, this case will be returned to the clerk for reassignment. ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. (Bono, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 08/21 10:58 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (adminn, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
4 4 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 08/17 5:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re3 MOTION to Seal Document with request for ex parte relief filed by Evan P Lowney. (Lowney, Evan)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs motion Seal Document Thu 08/17 5:06 PM
MOTION to Seal Document with request for ex parte relief by Evan P Lowney.(Lowney, Evan)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 08/17 5:03 PM
MOTION IFP Application re1 Complaint by Evan P Lowney.(Lowney, Evan)
Related: [-]
1 1 98 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/17 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Evan P Lowney.(Lowney, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form and Notice of No Consent,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 34 pgs Exhibit B