Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Whitman L Holt
Case #: 2:17-ap-00028
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2017
Terminated:Sep 13, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
contact info
Plaintiff
CAP CALL, LLC
122 East 42nd Street, Ste. 2112
New York, NY 10160
Represented By
HAROLD V DYE
contact info

GPO May 20 2019
Memorandum of Decision (related documents(s) 73 Motion to Compel filed by Counter-Defendant CAP CALL, LLC, Plaintiff CAP CALL, LLC, 85 Motion to Strike filed by Counter-Defendant CAP CALL, LLC, Plaintiff CAP CALL, LLC). (Montana, Colin)
GPO Nov 06 2020
Memorandum of Decision (related documents(s) 125 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Counter-Claimant WESTERN ALLIANCE BANK (dismissed 05/04/20), 160 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Counter-Defendant CAP CALL, LLC, Plaintiff CAP CALL, LLC). (Mahoney, Patti)
GPO Sep 10 2021
Memorandum OPINION (related documents(s) 238 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER, Counter-Claimant JEREMIAH J FOSTER, Defendant JEREMIAH J FOSTER). (Mahoney, Patti)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
300 300 audio Digital Audio Tue 09/13 4:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/13/2022 2:31:17 PM ]. File Size [ 5280 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:00 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (AdminMontana)
Related: [-]
299 299 court Minutes of Hearing Held Tue 09/13 3:37 PM
Minutes of Hearing Held; Appearances by: Kyle Ryan, Jeremiah Foster and Nicole Manos.Status update given by counsel for Trustee. The case to be closed. Hearing held in conjunction with cases BK 15-60979 AP 17-0043 and AP 17-0045 Hearing commenced at 02:31 and concluded at 02:43 Related [+]. (KJL)
Related: [-] 296 Order Setting Hearing
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/13 3:45 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-28 Closed. (JFW)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
298 298 notice Notice - ADV Fri 09/09 3:30 PM
Notice of Status Report Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]