Chin Kim v. CTX Mortgage Company, L.L.C.
Original Case: 4:17-cv-00144
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-pcf-10932 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 26, 2018 3:27 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
CONRAD CONSULTING, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHIN KIM
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2018 3:27 AM CDT |
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
1 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Chin Kim 17-10932 (NFD) |