Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:14-cr-20599
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2014
Terminated:Feb 27, 2024
Defendant
Amanda
Defendant
Amber Balcer
Defendant
Antwan Reid
Defendant
Chris Adams
Defendant
Chris Garner
Defendant
David Singer
Defendant
Edward Keeler
Defendant
Erez Arsoni
Defendant
Gregory Swarn
Defendant
Izhak Cohen
Defendant
Izhak Halbani
Defendant
Jack Gibbs
Defendant
Joe Epstein
Defendant
Joel Emilio Munoz
Defendant
Joey Ace
Defendant
John Trumble
Defendant
Joseph Arsenault
Defendant
Joseph Haden
Defendant
Keith Quagliarello
Defendant
Kenneth Frue
Defendant
Matthew Golden
Defendant
Michael Shore
Defendant
Michelle Pintado
Defendant
Mike Montgomery
Defendant
Mike Wallace
Defendant
Richard Pierce
Defendant
Richard Silverstein
Defendant
Robert Vernon Galik
Defendant
Robert Vernon Gallik
Defendant
Scott Amster
Defendant
Scott Green
Defendant
Scott Lipman
Defendant
Steven Goldstein
Defendant
Theodore Jacobs
Defendant
Wayne Scott Simpson
Plaintiff
United States of America

GPO Aug 22 2017
MEMORANDUM in Support of Judgment as to Matthew Golden re 513 Judgment. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
GPO May 24 2018
OPINION and Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part the Government's 576 MOTION for Order Finding Waiver of Privilege as to Joseph Arsenault, (Response re 547 Motion to Vacate due by 6/8/2018). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
GPO Sep 10 2018
ORDER denying 547 Motion to Vacate (2255) and 554 Amended Motion to Vacate as to Joseph Arsenault (8). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (SSch) Civil Case 2:18-cv-10019-SJM closed.
GPO Jun 16 2021
OPINION and ORDER Denying 712 Motion for Release from Custody as to Scott Amster (3). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
GPO Sep 08 2021
OPINION and ORDER Denying 721 Motion to Reduce Sentence as to Gregory Swarn (7). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
GPO Sep 28 2021
OPINION and ORDER Granting 719 Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release as to Matthew Golden (5). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)

Docket last updated: 09/03/2024 8:49 AM EDT
Thursday, September 25, 2014
1 1 INFORMATION as to Izhak Halbani (1) count(s) 1, Antwan Reid (2) count(s) 1, Scott Amster (3) count(s) 1, Richard Pierce (4) count(s) 1, Matthew Golden (5) count(s) 1. (DPer)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER WITH MOTION to Seal1 Information - Felony as to Izhak Halbani, Antwan Reid, Scott Amster, Richard Pierce, Matthew Golden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald A Scheer. (DPer)
Related: [-]