Carter v. Transport Workers Union of America Local 556
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Brantley Starr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02278 |
Nature of Suit | 740 Labor - Railway Labor Act |
Cause | 45:151 Railway Labor Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Mar 04, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2022 |
Case in other court: | USCA5, 23-10008 USCA5, 23-10008 USCA5, 23-10836 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 21, 2018 3:10 AM CST |
Defendant
Southwest Airlines Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Transport Workers Union of America Local 556
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlene Carter
|
Represented By
|
1. | In Federal Lawsuit, Former Southwest Attendant Claims She Was Canned over Anti-Abortion Beliefs (dallasobserver.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/11/2022 | |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
488 | 488
16
pgs
respm
Reply
Mon 09/25 8:11 PM
REPLY filed by Charlene Carter re:475 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Gilliam, Matthew) |
|
487 | 487
6
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 09/25 10:16 AM
MOTION to Supplement the Record on Appeal filed by Charlene Carter with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Gilliam, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 6 pgs Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 7 4 pgs Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 12 6 pgs Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 13 21 pgs Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 14 7 pgs Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 16 1 pgs Exhibit(s) Plaintiff Hearing Exhibit 18 |