The Wet Seal, LLC v. Amici Accessories, Ltd.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50979 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Amici Accessories, Ltd.
39 West 37th Street 2nd Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Wet Seal, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Wed 08/15 4:05 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 08/15 11:29 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50979 Closed (DMC) |
||
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/14 2:33 PM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Sixth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Order Signed on 8/14/2018 (LMD) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 08/14 10:56 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Thu 07/26 1:37 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 - Plaintiff's Sixth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Thu 07/26 12:47 PM
Status Report Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Mon 06/25 11:37 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 08/24/2018. (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Service - Notice
Tue 06/05 9:57 AM
Notice of Service - Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Amici Accessories, Ltd.'s, First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Thu 05/31 6:13 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Defendant's Responses and Objections To Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production Filed by Amici Accessories, Ltd. (Hauswirth, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/20 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/19/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
court
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate)
Tue 04/17 8:48 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Bifferato, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 6/18/2018. Signed on 4/17/2018. (DMC) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator
Fri 04/13 3:23 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Ian Connor Bifferato Between The Wet Seal, LLC and Amici Accessories, Ltd. . Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Mon 03/05 7:10 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Defendant's Responses and Objections To Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission Filed by Amici Accessories, Ltd. (Hauswirth, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Thu 02/01 12:55 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Re: Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures and Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Document Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC.. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/19 2:18 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Scheduling Order Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/18 8:09 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Amici Accessories, Ltd. Mediation due date: 04/17/2018. (Hauswirth, Gregory) |
|
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 12/18 2:43 PM
Scheduling Order (WITH REVISION OF THE COURT) Signed on 12/18/2017 (DMC) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Thu 12/14 10:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Service - Notice
Thu 12/14 9:07 AM
Notice of Service - Notice of Filing of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing - Notice
Thu 11/16 1:42 PM
Notice of Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/07 2:40 PM
Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Plaintiff Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 502, 547, 548 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code. Order Signed on 11/7/2017 (BJM) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 11/03 10:51 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 10/13 8:35 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Fri 09/22 12:26 PM
Motion to Approve Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/6/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Mon 09/18 1:32 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Amici Accessories, Ltd.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/17/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 08/30 9:23 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50979 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8565358, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 08/29 2:29 PM
Adversary case 17-50979 Complaint by The Wet Seal, LLC against Amici Accessories, Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 11/27/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |