The Wet Seal, LLC v. Cape Robbin Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50986 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cape Robbin Inc.
18052 Rowland Street
City of Industry, CA 91748 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Wet Seal, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Satisfaction of Judgment
Tue 05/07 12:33 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/10 9:49 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50986 Closed (DMC) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/28 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/27/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
court
Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b)
Wed 04/25 2:40 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Cape Robbin Inc. Signed on 4/25/2018. (DMC) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv)
Tue 04/24 11:47 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Withdrawal of Document - Notice
Fri 04/20 3:20 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Sunday, April 15, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 04/16 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/15/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
court
Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431)
Fri 04/13 11:12 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Cape Robbin Inc. Signed on 4/13/2018. (DMC) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Default Judgment - Motion
Thu 04/12 4:39 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Cape Robbin Inc. Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order -- Proposed Default Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
14 | 14
motion
Request for Entry of Default (Adv)
Thu 04/12 4:36 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Form of Order -- Entry of Default | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Thu 02/01 1:02 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Re: Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures and Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Document Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC.. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/19 2:18 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Scheduling Order Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 12/18 2:43 PM
Scheduling Order (WITH REVISION OF THE COURT) Signed on 12/18/2017 (DMC) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Thu 12/14 10:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Service - Notice
Thu 12/14 9:14 AM
Notice of Service - Notice of Filing of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing - Notice
Thu 11/16 1:42 PM
Notice of Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/07 2:40 PM
Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Plaintiff Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 502, 547, 548 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code. Order Signed on 11/7/2017 (BJM) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 11/03 10:51 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 10/13 9:01 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Fri 09/22 12:26 PM
Motion to Approve Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/6/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Mon 09/18 1:42 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Cape Robbin Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/17/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 08/30 9:23 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50986 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8565358, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 08/29 3:10 PM
Adversary case 17-50986 Complaint by The Wet Seal, LLC against Cape Robbin Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 11/27/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |