The Wet Seal, LLC v. RDG Global, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-51021 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
RDG Global, LLC
530 7th Avenue Suite 302
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Wet Seal, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Wed 10/10 3:05 PM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 10/09 10:21 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 10/02 3:00 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51021 Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/28 10:00 AM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Seventh Motion For An Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions. Signed on 9/27/2018 (DMC) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Thu 09/27 10:02 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiff's Seventh Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Wed 09/12 2:47 PM
Status Report Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Mon 08/27 12:02 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 - Plaintiff's Seventh Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
mediation
Mediator's Certificate of Completion
Thu 08/16 2:06 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Felger, Mark) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Thu 07/26 12:47 PM
Status Report Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Wed 07/18 11:18 AM
Mediation Status Report (Felger, Mark) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Thu 06/28 3:03 PM
Mediation Status Report (Felger, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/26 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 04/25/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
court
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate)
Mon 04/23 2:15 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Mark Felger, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 6/22/2018. Signed on 4/23/2018. (DMC) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator
Mon 04/23 10:47 AM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Mark E. Felger Between The Wet Seal, LLC and RDG Global, LLC . Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Wed 04/04 10:25 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery - Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission Filed by RDG Global, LLC (Mann, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Thu 02/01 1:09 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Re: Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures and Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Document Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC.. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Wed 01/31 4:27 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery - Defendant's Initial Disclosures Under Rule 26(a)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as Made Applicable Pursuant to Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Filed by RDG Global, LLC (Mann, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/19 2:42 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Scheduling Order Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 12/18 2:43 PM
Scheduling Order (WITH REVISION OF THE COURT) Signed on 12/18/2017 (DMC) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/18 2:42 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by RDG Global, LLC Mediation due date: 04/17/2018.(Mann, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Thu 12/14 10:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Service - Notice
Thu 12/14 10:04 AM
Notice of Service - Notice of Filing of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing - Notice
Thu 11/16 2:03 PM
Notice of Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/07 2:45 PM
Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Plaintiff Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 502, 547, 548 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code. Order Signed on 11/7/2017 (BJM) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 11/03 10:51 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 10/13 11:11 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Fri 09/22 12:26 PM
Motion to Approve Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/6/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Mon 09/18 2:27 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant RDG Global, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/17/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 08/30 9:23 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51021 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8565358, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 08/29 6:51 PM
Adversary case 17-51021 Complaint by The Wet Seal, LLC against RDG Global, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 11/27/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |