The Wet Seal, LLC v. Shalom International Corp.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10229
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-51027 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Shalom International Corp.
3 West 35th Street
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Wet Seal, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 02/20 12:40 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51027 Closed (DMC) |
||
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Mon 02/19 5:01 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Fri 02/16 4:27 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 02/16 2:47 PM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Third Motion For An Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Signed on 2/16/2018 (DMC) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 02/16 10:23 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Approve Settlement - Motion
Tue 01/30 1:25 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement - Plaintiff's Third Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Thu 12/14 10:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing - Notice
Thu 11/16 2:07 PM
Notice of Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/07 2:45 PM
Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Plaintiff Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 502, 547, 548 And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code. Order Signed on 11/7/2017 (BJM) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 11/03 10:51 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 10/13 11:28 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Fri 09/22 12:26 PM
Motion to Approve Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Wet Seal, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/6/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Mon 09/18 2:36 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Shalom International Corp.. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 11/17/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 08/30 9:23 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51027 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8565358, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 08/29 7:15 PM
Adversary case 17-51027 Complaint by The Wet Seal, LLC against Shalom International Corp.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 11/27/2017. (Augustine, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |