USA v. Azzam
New York Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 5:17-cr-00174 |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2017 6:24 AM EST |
Defendant
Khaled Azzam (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/04/2019 10:22 AM EST |
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for Waiver of Indictment and Change of Plea Hearing held on 8/30/17 before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby as to Khaled Azzam (1): Defendant is sworn, questioned by the Court and advised of his constitutional rights and consequences of waiving Indictment. The Waiver of Indictment is signed by Defendant, Defendants attorney and Judge and accepted by the Court for filing in case #5:17-cr-174. Defendant is advised of his constitutional rights and the consequences of pleading guilty. Defendant is arraigned and pleads guilty to Counts 1 and 2 of the Information and admits to forfeiture allegation. Government states a factual basis for the plea. Maximum possible penalties are stated for the record. Court accepts plea of Guilty to Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. Plea agreement is incorporated into the record. Court orders a Pre-Sentence Investigation Report from Probation. Sentencing is scheduled for 1/4/18 at 10:00 A.M. in Syracuse, New York. Judge requests that Defendant be moved from Cayuga County. Defendant is remanded to USMS. APP: Carla Freedman, AUSA; Kimberly Zimmer, Esq. for Defendant. CRD: L. Welch (Court Reporter: Eileen McDonough) (Time: 11:25 am - 12:03 pm) (lmw) | ||
17 | 17 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Khaled Azzam. (lmw) | |
18 | 18 INFORMATION as to Khaled Azzam (1) on Counts 1 and 2. (lmw) | |
19 | 19 21 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Khaled Azzam. (lmw) | |
20 | 20 2 pgs GUIDELINE ORDER as to Khaled Azzam : Sentencing set for 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. Government Sentencing Memo Deadline 12/14/2017. Defendant Sentencing Memo Deadline 12/14/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/30/17. (lmw) |