Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:17-cv-00979
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause18:1836(b) - Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2017
Terminated:Apr 04, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2018 3:34 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Raytheon Company
Represented By
Craig Crandall Reilly
Law Office Of Craig C. Reilly
contact info
Gregg Francis LoCascio
Kirkland & Ellis Llp (dc)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Peraton, Inc.
Represented By
Michael W. Robinson
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Nicholas Martin DePalma
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Christian Robert Schreiber
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Stephen Keith Gallagher
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Randall Karl Miller
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Taylor Sumner Chapman
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Kevin William Weigand
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Defendant
Raytheon Company
Represented By
Craig Crandall Reilly
Law Office Of Craig C. Reilly
contact info
Gregg Francis LoCascio
Kirkland & Ellis Llp (dc)
contact info
Interested Party
CACI International Inc
Represented By
David Anthony Vogel
Cooley Llp (va)
contact info
Douglas Paul Lobel
Cooley Llp (va)
contact info
Interested Party
DXC Technology Company
1775 Tysons Blvd
Tysons, VA 22102
Represented By
Jason Michael Crawford
Crowell & Moring Llp (dc)
contact info
David William O'Brien
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Peraton, Inc.
Represented By
Michael W. Robinson
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Nicholas Martin DePalma
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Christian Robert Schreiber
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Stephen Keith Gallagher
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Randall Karl Miller
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Taylor Sumner Chapman
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
Kevin William Weigand
Venable Llp (vienna)
contact info
John Scott Hommer, III
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
747 747 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Release of Bond Obligation Tue 11/01 2:40 PM
ORDER granting746 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. ORDERED that the $500 bond posted by Peraton on November 8, 2017 (Dkt. 16) be released and returned to Peraton Inc. and mailed to the office of Venable LLP at 8010 Towers Crescent Plaza, Suite 300, Vienna, Virginia 22182 to the attention of Taylor S. Chapman. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/1/2022. (swil)
Related: [-]