Folta v. The New York Times Company et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywell |
Referred: | Julie S Sneed |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-02102 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2018 4:04 AM EST |
Defendant
Eric Lipton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The New York Times Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Folta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark no number
Tue 10/10 12:20 PM
Case transferred from Florida Middle has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 1:17-cv-00246, filed 10/10/2017. (JNB) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/06 11:18 AM
ORDER: 1. This case is transferred to the United States District Court, Northern District of Florida, Gainesville Division, for all further proceedings. 2. The Clerk is directed to immediately transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida, Gainesville Division. 3. The Clerk is further directed to close this Middle District case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/6/2017. (BGS) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/06 11:12 AM
ORDER: The Court will take no further action on the Order to Show Cause 11 and it is discharged. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/6/2017. (BGS) |
|
utility
Remark no number
Fri 10/06 4:27 PM
Case Electronically Transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida - Gainesville Division. (AG) |
||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 10/05 3:30 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Kevin Folta.(Hull, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
18 | 18
misc
Response to order to show cause
Thu 10/05 3:23 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re11 Order to show cause filed by Kevin Folta. (Hull, Bryan) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of appearance
Mon 10/02 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carol J. Locicero on behalf of Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company (Locicero, Carol) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of appearance
Mon 10/02 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Richard Caramanica on behalf of Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company (Caramanica, Mark) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on motion for extension of time to answer
Mon 09/25 10:43 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Eric Lipton answer or response due 10/17/2017; The New York Times Company answer or response due 10/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 9/25/2017. (SMC) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 09/22 9:53 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Thomas, Gregg) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified event type on 9/22/2017 (CTR) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Fri 09/22 9:50 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company identifying Other Affiliate Carol J. LoCicero, Other Affiliate The New York Times Company, Other Affiliate Gregg D. Thomas, Other Affiliate Kevin Folta, Other Affiliate Eric Lipton, Other Affiliate Thomas & LoCicero PL, Other Affiliate Mark R. Caramanica, Other Affiliate Allison K. Simpson, Other Affiliate Grupo Finaciero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company.. (Thomas, Gregg) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of appearance
Fri 09/22 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg Darrow Thomas on behalf of Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company (Thomas, Gregg) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
5
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Thu 09/21 1:17 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and, if jurisdiction is established, transferred to the Northern District of Florida, Gainesville Division. Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Additionally, within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS, Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint which cures the jurisdictional deficiencies discussed in this Order. Failure to respond within the time provided will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/21/2017. (BGS) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Tue 09/19 1:38 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kevin Folta. Related case(s): no (Evangelista, James) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 09/19 1:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Kevin Folta. (Evangelista, James) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Mon 09/18 12:33 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Lane R. Jubb, Jr., appearing on behalf of Kevin Folta (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA045857). (LMD) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Mon 09/18 12:35 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney James E. Beasley, Jr., appearing on behalf of Kevin Folta (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA045857). (LMD) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 09/08 10:46 AM
ORDER granting 7 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 9/8/2017. (JR) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 09/07 3:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for James E. Beasley and Lane R. Jubb to appear pro hac vice by Kevin Folta. (Evangelista, James) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of appearance
Wed 09/06 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan D. Hull on behalf of Kevin Folta (Hull, Bryan) |
|
5 | 5
order
Interested persons order
Wed 09/06 8:14 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/20/2017. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/6/2017. (BGS) |
|
4 | 4
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Wed 09/06 8:13 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/20/2017. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/6/2017. (BGS) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Tue 09/05 11:38 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Eric Lipton. (LMD) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons issued
Tue 09/05 11:38 AM
SUMMONS issued as to The New York Times Company. (LMD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/05 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA045655) filed by Kevin Folta.(LMD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |