Seidman v. ComicBook.com, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Loretta A Preska |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-06762 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 04, 2018 3:45 AM EST |
Defendant
ComicBook.com, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Helayne Seidman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Tue 10/03 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CIVIL ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)): IT IS HEREBY NOTICED that a settlement has been reached between the parties and the above case should be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motions denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/3/2017) (jwh) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Mon 10/02 8:38 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/28/2017 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/28 2:24 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) ComicBook.com, LLC. Document filed by Helayne Seidman. (Liebowitz, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Wed 09/06 4:21 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/06 9:53 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ComicBook.com, LLC. (pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 09/06 9:50 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 09/06 9:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 09/06 9:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Tue 09/05 11:16 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Liebowitz, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 09/05 11:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 09/05 11:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ComicBook.com, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Helayne Seidman. (Liebowitz, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/05 11:07 PM
COMPLAINT against ComicBook.com, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14092042)Document filed by Helayne Seidman.(Liebowitz, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |