Addie Gwinn v. Accudata Credit Systems, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01795 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 04, 2018 12:39 AM PST |
Defendant
Accudata Credit Systems, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Leonard L Gumport
Gumport | Mastan 550 S. Hope Street Suite 1765
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
|
Plaintiff
Addie Gwinn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Dismiss Case
Mon 08/13 10:08 AM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting25 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice as to the Named Plaintiff and without Prejudice as to the Putative Class. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 08/09 11:51 AM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Addie Gwinn. (Hart, Yana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
24 | 24
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 08/09 9:53 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the notice of settlement filed March 5, 2018 (Doc. No. 22), indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By August 23, 2018, the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of August 24, 2018. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jlo) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Not Held - Settled
Mon 03/05 4:07 PM
MEDIATION REPORT filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Leonard L Gumport: A mediation did not take place because the case settled before the session occurred.(Gumport, Leonard) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/05 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Addie Gwinn.(Conforti, Clark) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Thu 02/22 11:11 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for May 15, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. at the Offices of Gumport | Mastan, 550 S. Hope Street, Suite 1765, Los Angeles, CA 90071-2627.(Gumport, Leonard) |
|
Saturday, February 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Sat 02/10 3:18 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Clark Robert Conforti counsel for Plaintiff Addie Gwinn. Adding Clark Robert Conforti as counsel of record for Addie Gwinn for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Addie Gwinn.(Attorney Clark Robert Conforti added to party Addie Gwinn(pty:pla))(Conforti, Clark) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Fri 02/02 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Leonard L Gumport has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Tue 01/16 2:11 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Leonard Gumport may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Addie Gwinn(Hart, Yana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Signature, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Wed 12/27 9:43 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 2 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/27/2018. (iva) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Mon 12/11 3:21 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2018. Discovery cut-off 7/30/2018. Motions due by 10/15/2018. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/27/2018 (Attorney Settlement Officer Panel). Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 12/11/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See Order for details. (ima) |
|
15 | 15
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 12/11 1:49 PM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: A trial schedule was set. See separate trial scheduling order for more details. Pursuant to L.R. 16-15.4, the parties have selected the following settlement procedure: ADR Settlement Choice: Attorney Settlement Officer Panel. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Adele C Frazier. (ad) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 11/27 12:53 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 to 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Addie Gwinn..(Hart, Yana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 11/03 10:58 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 10/31 2:07 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Accudata Credit Systems, LLC, (Kaminski, David) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 10/31 2:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Accudata Credit Systems, LLC.(Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Accudata Credit Systems, LLC(pty:dft))(Kaminski, David) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Fri 09/08 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian on behalf of Plaintiff Addie Gwinn(Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Addie Gwinn(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of service | ||
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Fri 09/08 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Yana A Hart on behalf of Plaintiff Addie Gwinn(Hart, Yana) |
|
Att: 1 certificate of service | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 09/08 12:20 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 09/05 2:05 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Accudata Credit Systems, LLC. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 09/05 2:03 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 09/05 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 09/05 12:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Addie Gwinn. (Swigart, Joshua) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 09/05 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Addie Gwinn, (Swigart, Joshua) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 09/05 12:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Addie Gwinn. (Swigart, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 09/05 12:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20454004 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Addie Gwinn. (Attorney Joshua B Swigart added to party Addie Gwinn(pty:pla))(Swigart, Joshua) |