Maximus III Properties LLC
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Arthur I Harris |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-41723 |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Maximus III Properties LLC
2016 Isabelle Dr
Girard, OH 44420-1179 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Daniel M. McDermott, United States Trustee for Region 9
Cleveland, OH 44114
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2017 8:00 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 09/07 1:44 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-41723 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 36586491. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 09/07 1:37 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual (Fee Amount $1717.00), List Of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims, List Of Equity Security Holders, Corporate Ownership Statement, And Disclosure Of Compensation Of Attorney For Debtor Filed by Maximus III Properties, LLC. (Partlow, Michael aty) Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/05/2018, Disclosure Statement due by 01/05/2018, Schedule A/B due 09/21/2017, Schedule D due 09/21/2017, Schedule E/F due 09/21/2017, Schedule G due 09/21/2017, Schedule H due 09/21/2017, Statement Of Financial Affairs due 09/21/2017, Summary Of Assets And Liabilities due 09/21/2017, and Incomplete Filings due by 09/21/2017. Modified on 9/7/2017 (mjanc) |
|
2 | 2
court
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Thu 09/07 1:48 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Maximus III Properties LLC. (Partlow, Michael aty) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Resolution
Thu 09/07 1:58 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Maximus III Properties LLC. (Partlow, Michael aty) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 09/07 3:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Scott R. Belhorn ust35 Filed by U.S. Trustee Daniel M. McDermott, United States Trustee for Region 9. (ust35, Scott R. Belhorn tr) |