New Jersey District Court
Judge:Anne E Thompson
Referred: Lois H Goodman
Case #: 3:17-cv-06857
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2017
Terminated:Jan 30, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 06, 2018 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
AZARIA BRIDAL, LLC
Represented By
MARC D. HAEFNER
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
COLLEEN M. MAKER
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
Defendant
PRITI MADAN
Represented By
MARC D. HAEFNER
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
COLLEEN M. MAKER
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
Defendant
RAJA MADAN
Represented By
MARC D. HAEFNER
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
COLLEEN M. MAKER
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CASTLE COUTURE, LLC
Represented By
CRAIG S. HILLIARD
Stark & Stark, PC
contact info
GENE MARKIN
Stark & Stark PC
contact info

GPO Sep 18 2020
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/18/2020. (jem)

Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Friday, September 18, 2020
45 45 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 09/18 3:50 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's35 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement; Defendants must execute the Settlement Agreement within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; the Clerk of the Court shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/18/2020. (jem)
Related: [-]
44 44 7 pgs order Opinion Fri 09/18 3:50 PM
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/18/2020. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
43 43 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 08/31 4:26 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CASTLE COUTURE, LLC re35 MOTION to Compel /Enforce Settlement (HILLIARD, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplemental Declaration.Hilliard,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Supp. Dec. Hilliard,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Supp. Dec. Hilliard,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Supp. Dec. Hilliard,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Supp. Dec. Hilliard,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 Supp. Dec. Hilliard
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
42 42 1 pgs order Order Wed 08/26 12:38 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the request41 to file reply papers re Motion to Enforce Settlement35 by 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 8/26/2020. (jem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
41 41 misc Letter Tue 08/25 12:06 PM
Letter from Craig S. Hilliard, Esq. re40 Order. (HILLIARD, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
40 40 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/18 10:57 AM
LETTER ORDER granting the request39 for an extension of time, until 8/25/2020, to file a reply to the opposition38 . Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 8/18/2020. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
39 39 misc Letter Mon 08/17 1:00 PM
Letter from Craig S. Hilliard, Esq. re38 Certification in Opposition to Motion,37 Order. (HILLIARD, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
38 38 respm Certification in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/12 5:23 PM
CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by All Defendants re35 MOTION to Compel /Enforce Settlement (RABIN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Final Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Emails between Counsel,
Att: 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Defendant Madan,
Att: 4 Exhibit Final Version of Announcement,
Att: 5 Exhibit August 2018 Term Sheet,
Att: 6 Exhibit Case Docket Summary,
Att: 7 Brief Memo of Law
Monday, August 03, 2020
37 37 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/03 1:31 PM
LETTER ORDER that the Court will allow Defendant to file an opposition or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Motion35 within ten (10) days of the date of this letter. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 8/03/2020. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
36 36 misc Letter Fri 07/31 12:42 PM
Letter from Howard Rabin. (RABIN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 31, 2020
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Sun 05/31 7:02 PM
Set Deadlines as to35 MOTION to Compel /Enforce Settlement . Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 30, 2020
35 35 motion Compel Sat 05/30 3:54 PM
MOTION to Compel /Enforce Settlement by CASTLE COUTURE, LLC.(HILLIARD, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration of Craig Hilliard, Esq.,
Att: 3 Exhibit A Hilliard Dec.,
Att: 4 Exhibit B Hilliard Dec.,
Att: 5 Exhibit C Hilliard Dec.,
Att: 6 Exhibit D Hilliard Dec.,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/31 11:35 AM
ORDER that the32 Order entered on 1/30/2020 administratively terminating this action is extended for an additional 60 days, through and including, 5/30/2020. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 3/31/2020. (jem)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/31 11:37 AM
Reset Deadlines: Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/30/2020. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
33 33 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/30 3:37 PM
MOTION to Extend the 60-Day Order Terminating the Action by CASTLE COUTURE, LLC.(HILLIARD, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Craig S. Hilliard, Esq.,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/30 5:28 PM
Set Deadlines as to33 MOTION to Extend the 60-Day Order Terminating the Action . Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
32 32 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 01/30 2:54 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement.( Administrative Termination deadline set for 3/30/2020). Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 1/30/2020. (adi, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
31 31 order Order on Oral Motion Fri 01/10 9:26 AM
TEXT ORDER that the Settlement Conference scheduled for 01/10/2020 is hereby CANCELLED; by no later than 01/13/2020 Counsel are to report to the Court in writing as to the status of their efforts to resolve this matter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 01/10/2020. (Gonzalez, P)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2020
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 01/10 11:12 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 1/9/2020. (if, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
30 30 order Order on Oral Motion Wed 01/08 11:52 AM
TEXT ORDER setting an In Person Settlement Conference for 1/10/2020 at 11:30 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Telephone Conference Call set for 1/9/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/8/2020. (if, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 01/07 9:36 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Settlement Conference held on 1/6/2020 via Telephone Conference. (if, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
29 29 order Order on Oral Motion Fri 01/03 11:43 AM
TEXT ORDER the Telephone Conference Call scheduled for 1/3/2020 with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman has been rescheduled to 1/6/2020 at 12:30 p.m. So Ordered by by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/3/2020. (if, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
28 28 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/23 5:22 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by CASTLE COUTURE, LLC re24 First MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Settlement (MARKIN, GENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
27 27 order Order on Oral Motion Wed 12/18 2:35 PM
TEXT ORDER rescheduling the Telephone Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 9:30 a.m. to 12:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/18/19. (if, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2019
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/27 10:37 AM
LETTER ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to24 First MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Settlement . Motion reset for 1/6/2020 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/27/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
25 25 misc Letter Tue 11/26 3:46 PM
Letter from Gene Markin, Esq.. (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/26 10:33 AM
Resetting Deadlines as to24 First MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Settlement . Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (if, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
24 24 motion Motion to Quash/Compel/Enforce Fri 11/22 3:26 PM
First MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Settlement by AZARIA BRIDAL, LLC.(RABIN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Motion to Enforce Settlement,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Kunal Madan
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/22 4:58 PM
Set Deadlines as to24 First MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Settlement . Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/30 1:04 PM
AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/30/2019. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2019
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 10/08 4:19 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 10/7/2019. (if, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
22 22 order Order on Oral Motion Thu 10/03 11:47 AM
TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference Call for 10/7/9 at 12:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Mr. Hilliard to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/3/19. (if, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
21 21 order Order on Oral Motion Thu 08/01 9:25 AM
TEXT ORDER directing counsel to report on case status by 8/23/19. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/1/19. (if, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
20 20 order Order on Oral Motion Wed 07/10 11:18 AM
TEXT ORDER directing counsel to report on case status by 7/31/19. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/10/19. (if, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
19 19 order Order on Oral Motion Thu 04/18 1:34 PM
TEXT ORDER directing counsel to submit a joint report by 5/15/19 as to their efforts to finalize the settlement. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 4/18/19. (if, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
18 18 misc Substitution of Attorney Mon 04/15 12:08 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney COLLEEN M. MAKER terminated. Attorney HOWARD RUSSELL RABIN for AZARIA BRIDAL, LLC,HOWARD RUSSELL RABIN for PRITI MADAN,HOWARD RUSSELL RABIN for RAJA MADAN added.. (RABIN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Substitution of Attorney Mon 04/15 12:05 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney MARC D. HAEFNER terminated.. (RABIN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 04/16 11:56 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 4/15/2019. (if, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
misc Docket Annotation (public) Tue 04/09 10:23 AM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: Telephone Conference Call set for 4/15/19 at 12:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. (if, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 02/08 10:48 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 2/7/2019. (if, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
misc Docket Annotation (public) Tue 02/05 9:46 AM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: Telephone Conference Call set for 2/7/19 at 2:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. (if, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 09/17 11:08 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2018. (if, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
misc Docket Annotation (public) Mon 09/10 12:48 PM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: Telephone Conference Call set for 9/14/18 at 10:30 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Defendant's counsel to initiate the call at that time. (if, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 09/10 12:45 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 9/7/2018. (if, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
16 16 order Order on Oral Motion Thu 09/06 4:24 PM
TEXT ORDER setting a Telephone Conference for 9/7/18 at 12:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Defendant's counsel to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/6/18. (if, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
misc Docket Annotation (public) Tue 09/04 11:34 AM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: Telephone Conference Call set for 9/4/18 at 3:30 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. (if, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 09/05 12:03 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2018. (if, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 30, 2018
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 09/04 10:20 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Settlement Conference held on 8/30/2018. (if, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
15 15 order Order on Oral Motion Tue 08/21 10:25 AM
TEXT ORDER rescheduling the Settlement Conference scheduled for 8/27/18 with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman to 8/30/18 at 10:00 a.m. Ex parte settlement positions are due by 8/27/18. Ex parte positions are not to exceed 5 pages. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/21/18. (if, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 08/21 10:26 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 8/21/2018. (if, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
misc Docket Annotation (public) Fri 08/17 8:45 AM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: Telephone Conference Call set for 8/21/18 at 10:00 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. (if, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
14 14 order Order on Oral Motion Wed 06/27 5:14 PM
TEXT ORDER setting a Settlement Conference for 8/27/18 at 10:00 a.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Ex parte settlement positions due 5 days before the scheduled conference. Each position not exceed 5 pages. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/27/18. (if, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 06/28 4:53 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 6/27/2018. (if, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
misc Docket Annotation (public) Mon 06/25 10:01 AM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Settlement Conference scheduled for 6/27/18 at 2:30 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman has been converted to a Conference Call. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. (if, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/17 4:08 PM
AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2018 02:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Counsel and parties with full authority to settle are to be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/17/2018. (mps)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 05/08 11:33 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 5/7/2018. (if, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
misc Docket Annotation (public) Tue 05/01 3:26 PM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Settlement Conference scheduled for 5/7/18 at 2:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman has been converted into a Conference Call. Defendants' counsel to initiate the call at that time. (if, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 02/07 2:53 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2018. (if, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
12 12 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/19 3:20 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/7/2018 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Counsel and parties with full authority to settle are to be present. Telephone Status Conference set for 2/6/2018 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/19/2018. (mps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 01/02 11:40 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/19/2017. (if, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
11 11 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Thu 10/19 11:54 AM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/19/2017. (mps)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2017
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/28 4:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(HAEFNER, MARC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
9 9 misc Letter Tue 09/26 5:56 PM
Letter from Marc D. Haefner to the Honorable Lois H. Goodman, U.S.M.J..(HAEFNER, MARC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certification of Marc D. Haefner in Support of Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order
Friday, September 22, 2017
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/22 11:52 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CASTLE COUTURE, LLC. (HILLIARD, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/20 10:11 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AZARIA BRIDAL, LLC, PRITI MADAN, RAJA MADAN. (HAEFNER, MARC)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Disclosure Statement filed as an Attachment Wed 09/20 10:01 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal1 filed by Marc D. Haefner on 9/7/2017 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (eaj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
6 6 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 09/19 1:29 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2017 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/19/2017. (mps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/12 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GENE MARKIN on behalf of CASTLE COUTURE, LLC (MARKIN, GENE)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 09/12 9:18 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AZARIA BRIDAL, LLC, PRITI MADAN, RAJA MADAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/28/2017. (mps)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 09/11 4:37 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (HAEFNER, MARC)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/11 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by COLLEEN M. MAKER on behalf of AZARIA BRIDAL, LLC, PRITI MADAN, RAJA MADAN (MAKER, COLLEEN)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/11 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARC D. HAEFNER on behalf of AZARIA BRIDAL, LLC, PRITI MADAN, RAJA MADAN (HAEFNER, MARC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2017
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/07 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AZARIA BRIDAL, LLC, PRITI MADAN, RAJA MADAN from Monmouth County Superior Court, case number MON-L-2658-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8073208), filed by AZARIA BRIDAL, LLC, PRITI MADAN, RAJA MADAN.(HAEFNER, MARC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Superior Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,
Att: 3 Notice of Removal to Superior Court,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/07 12:19 PM
Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (eaj, )
Related: [-]